EP2411808 - DEVICES AND METHODS OF CELL CAPTURE AND ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biocept, Inc. 5810 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKOLAJCZYK, Stephen 4052 Conrad Ave. San Diego California 92117 / US | 02 /
PIRCHER, Tony 11643 Chippenham Way San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 03 /
TSINBERG, Pavel 2356 Caringa Way Unit C Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 04 /
BISCHOFF, Farideh 3314 N. Briarpark Lane Sugar Land, TX 77479 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2015/46] |
Former [2012/05] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10756790.1 | 24.03.2010 | [2015/46] | WO2010US28499 | Priority number, date | US20090163009P | 24.03.2009 Original published format: US 163009 P | US20090235615P | 20.08.2009 Original published format: US 235615 P | US20100298871P | 27.01.2010 Original published format: US 298871 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111388 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411808 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411808 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/574, C12Q1/02 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/536 (US);
G01N33/56966 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
G01N33/57492 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR ZELLERFASSUNG UND -ANALYSE | [2012/05] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS OF CELL CAPTURE AND ANALYSIS | [2012/05] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE CAPTURE ET D'ANALYSE DE CELLULES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 15.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15188374.1 / EP2995953 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 15.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2012 | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2010 | AT | 11.11.2015 | BE | 11.11.2015 | BG | 11.11.2015 | CY | 11.11.2015 | CZ | 11.11.2015 | DK | 11.11.2015 | EE | 11.11.2015 | FI | 11.11.2015 | HR | 11.11.2015 | LT | 11.11.2015 | LV | 11.11.2015 | MC | 11.11.2015 | MK | 11.11.2015 | NL | 11.11.2015 | PL | 11.11.2015 | RO | 11.11.2015 | SE | 11.11.2015 | SI | 11.11.2015 | SK | 11.11.2015 | SM | 11.11.2015 | TR | 11.11.2015 | NO | 11.02.2016 | GR | 12.02.2016 | IS | 11.03.2016 | PT | 11.03.2016 | IE | 24.03.2016 | LU | 24.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
TR | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 11.11.2015 | ||
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CY | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MK | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
MT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
IE | 24.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
BE | 11.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
MC | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SI | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
LU | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
DK | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
SM | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
EE | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
RO | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
SK | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
CZ | 11.11.2015 | ||
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
LV | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 11.11.2015 | |
FI | 11.11.2015 | ||
HR | 11.11.2015 | ||
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
PL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
GR | 12.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
PT | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 11.11.2015 | |
LT | 11.11.2015 | ||
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
SE | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NL | 11.11.2015 | ||
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
IS | 11.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 11.11.2015 | |
NO | 11.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 11.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0000826 (CAMBRIDGE SENSORS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 14 * page 3, lines 28-32; claims 1,3 *; | [XP]US2009215088 (FORSYTH ALLYN [US], et al) [XP] 1-5,8,9,11,14 * figures 2,7,8; claims 1,6,8 *; | [T] - Mary Nora Dickson ET AL, "Efficient capture of circulating tumor cells with a novel immunocytochemical microfluidic device", doi:10.1063/1.3623748], (20110822), pages 34119 - 1, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3364832/pdf/BIOMGB-000005-034119_1.pdf, (20120731), XP055034319 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3623748 | International search | [A]US6368871 (CHRISTEL LEE ALLAN [US], et al); | [A]US2002172987 (TERSTAPPEN LEON W M M [US], et al); | [A]US6613525 (NELSON ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US2006000772 (SANO TORU [JP], et al); | [A]US2006160243 (TANG ZHONGLIANG [US], et al); | [A]US2007161051 (TSINBERG PAVEL [US], et al) | Examination | WO8402193 | WO03050537 | US2006160243 | by applicant | WO03050537 | US2006160243 | - NAGRATH ET AL., NATURE, (2007), vol. 450, no. 7173, pages 1235 - 9 |