EP2414677 - COMPRESSOR PLUG ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. 1675 W. Campbell Road Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIDECKER, Matthew J. 425 E. Franklin Street Troy OH 45373 / US | 02 /
WAESCH, David Alan 6543 Dawson Road Sidney Ohio 45365 / US | 03 /
PEYTON, Jesse T. 932 Broadway Street Piqua Ohio 45356 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10756845.3 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010US28667 | Priority number, date | US20090164149P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 164149 P | US20100730782 | 24.03.2010 Original published format: US 730782 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111492 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2414677 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/12, H01R13/04, H01R13/514, H01R13/52, H01R13/639 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
F04B39/121 (EP,US);
F04B39/12 (KR);
F04B39/00 (KR);
H01R13/04 (KR);
H01R13/514 (KR);
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | F04B39/12, H01R13/04, H01R13/514, F04B39/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSORSTECKERANORDNUNG | [2012/06] | English: | COMPRESSOR PLUG ASSEMBLY | [2012/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE PRISE DE COMPRESSEUR | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2009060749 (HOYING JEFFREY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 12-15 [Y] 4-11; | [XY]US2006068626 (HASEGAWA TAKEHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] - [0027] - [0034] * [Y] 4-11,14; | [XY]US5584716 (BERGMAN ERNEST [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-12 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, lines 20-46 * * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 23 * [Y] 2-11; | [XY]WO2007074852 (SANDEN CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-11; | [Y]US3850496 (HAGUE J) [Y] 5-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 15 *; | [Y]US6570097 (MONDE HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,11-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-8,30-60 * * column 6, lines 22-33 *; | [Y]US5580282 (PATEREK F DIETER [US]) [Y] 2-4,12-15 * figure - * * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 50 *; | [A]US2003156954 (KIMURA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2b * * paragraphs [0036] - [0055] * | International search | [X]JP2006097557 (SANDEN CORP); | [A]JPH0932775 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]US4964788 (ITAMERI-KINTER TERRY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009060749 |