EP2467478 - Stabilisation of enzymes with stable coenzymes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | STABILIZATION OF ENZYMES USING STABLE COENZYMES | ||
[2015/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖDEL, Wolfgang Johanniterstr. 9 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
HORN, Carina Frankenstr. 5 68647 Biblis / DE | 03 /
STEINKE, Nelli Clara-Schumann-Weg 7 68623 Lampertheim / DE | 04 /
BUCCI, Nadine Zum Keitelberg 22 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 05 /
MEIER, Thomas Drachenseestr. 12 81373 München / DE | 06 /
SCHMUCK, Rainer Am Klosterweiher 7 83671 Benediktbeuern / DE | 07 /
NAGEL, Rolf Pestalozzistr. 1 68642 Bürstadt / DE | 08 /
HEINDL, Dieter Sternstr. 4 82396 Paehl / DE | [2012/29] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
RÖDEL, Wolfgang Johanniterstr. 9 69123 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
HORN, Carina Frankenstr. 5 68647 Biblis / DE | |||
03 /
STEINKE, Nelli Orangeriestr. 6 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
BUCCI, Nadine Zum Keitelberg 22 69168 Wiesloch / DE | |||
05 /
MEIER, Thomas Drachenseestr. 12 81373 München / DE | |||
06 /
SCHMUCK, Rainer Am Klosterweiher 7 83671 Benediktbeuern / DE | |||
07 /
NAGEL, Rolf Pestalozzistr. 1 68642 Bürstadt / DE | |||
08 /
HEINDL, Dieter Sternstr. 4 82396 Paehl / DE | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10757053.3 | 18.08.2010 | [2015/38] | WO2010EP62045 | Priority number, date | EP20090168327 | 20.08.2009 Original published format: EP 09168327 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020856 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467478 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467478 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/04 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
C12N9/96 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/0004 (KR);
C12N9/0006 (EP,US);
C12N9/0036 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (KR,US);
C12Q1/32 (US);
C12Y101/01001 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01002 (EP,US);
C12Y101/01047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | C12N9/96, C12N9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG VON ENZYMEN MIT STABILEN COENZYMEN | [2012/26] | English: | Stabilisation of enzymes with stable coenzymes | [2015/16] | French: | Stabilisation d'enzymes à l'aide de coenzymes stables | [2015/16] |
Former [2012/26] | STABILIZATION OF ENZYMES USING STABLE COENZYMES | ||
Former [2012/26] | STABILISATION D'ENZYMES PAR DES COENZYMES STABLES | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 27.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2010 | AL | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XP]EP2093284 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 12,21 * * page 5, paragraph 24 * * page 7; example 1 * * page 9 - page 12; claims 1-23 *; | [XDA]WO2007012494 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [XD] 10-12 * abstract * * page 6, line 9 - line 12 * * page 10, line 31 - page 13, line 22 * * page 16, line 7 - line 13 * [A] 1-9,13-16; | [XDA]WO9833936 (SPECIALTY ASSAYS INC [US]) [XD] 10-12 * abstract * * page 9, line 8 - line 11 * * page 16, line 1 - line 10 * * page 47 - page 48; claims 35,44 * [A] 1-9,13-16; | [XA]WO9719190 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 10-12 * abstract * * page 8; claims 1-6,8 * [A] 1-9,13-16; | [I] - OSBORNE H H ET AL, "AN INVESTIGATION OF THE NAD INDUCED TIGHTENING OF THE STRUCTURE OF GLYCERALDEHYDE 3 PHOSPHATE DEHYDROGENASE EC-1.2.1.12", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1976), vol. 157, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 255 - 259, XP002553207 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 255, column R, paragraph L - page 256, column L, paragraph 1 * | [A] - ZHAO KEHAO ET AL, "Structural basis for nicotinamide cleavage and ADP-ribose transfer by NAD+-dependent Sir2 histone/protein deacetylases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20040608), vol. 101, no. 23, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8563 - 8568, XP002553208 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0401057101 | by applicant | WO0194370 | WO9833936 | US5801006 | WO0149247 | WO2007012494 | WO2005045016 | DE2061984 | US2007196899 | US2005214891 | WO03097859 | - N.J. OPPENHEIMER, The Pyridine Nucleotide Coenzyms, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1982), vol. 3, pages 56 - 65 | - N.O. KAPLAN, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1956), vol. 221, page 823 | - J.T. SLAMA, BIOCHEMISTRY, (1988), vol. 27, page 183 | - BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, page 7688 | - G.M. BLACKBURN, CHEM. COMM., (1996), page 2765 | - BERTOLDI ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (2005), vol. 389, page 885 | - VAN DEN HEUVEL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, page 32115 | - PAN ET AL., J. CHIN. BIOCHEM. SOC., (1974), vol. 3, page 1 | - NUTRITION REVIEWS, (1978), vol. 36, page 251 | - BAIK, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 71, page 3285 | - VäSQUEZ-FIGUEROA, CHEMBIOCHEM, (2007), vol. 8, page 2295 | US20060460366 |