EP2483247 - NEW BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FXR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENSON, Gregory Martin Teichstrasse 3 CH-4106 Therwil / CH | 02 /
BLEICHER, Konrad Reichsgrafenstrasse 16 79102 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
FENG, Song 237 Bohua Road Building 47 Room 602 Shanghai 201204 / CN | 04 /
GRETHER, Uwe Kirchgasse 4 79588 Efringen-Kirchen / DE | 05 /
KUHN, Bernd Hinterlindenweg 26a CH-4153 Reinach BL / CH | 06 /
MARTIN, Rainer E. Vogesenstrasse 47 CH-4056 Basel / CH | 07 /
PLANCHER, Jean-Marc 9 rue des Vignes F-68220 Hagenthal-le-Bas / FR | 08 /
RICHTER, Hans Winkelmatten 6 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 09 /
RUDOLPH, Markus Loewenbergstrasse 24 CH-4059 Basel / CH | 10 /
TAYLOR, Sven 6 rue des Bosquets F-68400 Riedisheim / FR | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 10757215.8 | 27.09.2010 | WO2010EP64217 | Priority number, date | EP20090171700 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: EP 09171700 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011039130 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483247 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/18, C07D401/04, C07D403/10, C07D403/12, C07D405/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/4184, A61K31/4439 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D235/18 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | NEUE BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS FXR AGONISTEN | [2016/35] | English: | NEW BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS FXR AGONISTS | [2012/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION ENT TANT QU'AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR FXR | [2016/35] |
Former [2012/32] | NEUE BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS FXR-AGONISTEN | ||
Former [2012/32] | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'AGONISTES DE FXR | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 26.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.07.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008000643 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X]WO2008101586 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,11-18 * page 54 - page 55; claim 1 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 2 * | by applicant | - MAKISHIMA, M.; OKAMOTO, A. Y.; REPA, J. J.; TU, H.; LEARNED, R. M.; LUK, A.; HULL, M. V.; LUSTIG, K. D.; MANGELSDORF, D. J.; SHAN,, SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 1362 - 1365 | - LU, T. T.; MAKISHIMA, M.; REPA, J. J.; SCHOONJANS, K.; KERR, T. A.; AUWERX, J.; MANGELSDORF, D. J., MOL. CELL, (2000), vol. 6, pages 507 - 515 | - KAST, H. R.; GOODWIN, B.; TARR, P. T.; JONES, S. A.; ANISFELD, A. M.; STOLTZ, C. M.; TONTONOZ, P.; KLIEWER, S.; WILLSON, T. M.; ED, BIOL. CHERN., (2002), vol. 277, pages 2908 - 2915 | - ANANTHANARAYANAN, M.; BALASUBRAMANIAN, N.; MAKISHIMA, M.; MANGELSDORF, D. J.; SUCHY, F. J., BIOL. CHERN., (2001), vol. 276, pages 28857 - 28865 | - LIU, Y.; BINZ, J.; NUMERICK, M. J.; DENNIS, S.; LUO, G.; DESAI, B.; MACKENZIE, K. L; MANSFIELD, T. A.; KLIEWER, S. A.; GOODWIN, B., CLIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 112, pages 1678 - 1687 | - SINAL, C. J.; TOHKIN, M.; MIYATA, M.; WARD, J. M.; LAMBERT, G.; GONZALEZ, F. J., CELL, (2000), vol. 102, pages 731 - 744 | - DATTA, S.; WANG, L.; MOORE, D. D.; OSBORNE, T. F., BIOL. CHERN., (2006), vol. 281, pages 807 - 812 | - NICHOLS J S ET AL., "Development of a scintillation proximity assay for peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor gamma ligand binding domain", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 257, doi:doi:10.1006/abio.1997.2557, pages 112 - 119, XP002214931 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1997.2557 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, WILEY PRESS |