EP2481110 - HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G4 Synergetics, Inc. Three Expressway Plaza Roslyn, NY 11577 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, Jon K. 1931 N.W. 47th Street Gainesville, Florida 32605 / US | 02 /
WEST, Daniel J. 1931 N.W. 47th Street Gainesville, Florida 32605 / US | 03 /
REGALADO, Julius 1208 S.W. 1st Avenue Gainesville, Florida 32601 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Xin 2026 N.W. 36th Street Gainesville, Florida 32605 / US | 05 /
CLARK, Miles 213 N.W. 8th Street Gainesville, Florida 32601 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10757551.6 | 21.09.2010 | WO2010US49654 | Priority number, date | US20090244826P | 22.09.2009 Original published format: US 244826 P | US20090245121P | 23.09.2009 Original published format: US 245121 P | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011037919 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2481110 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/02 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H01M4/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0421 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (KR);
H01M4/62 (KR);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSELEKTRODEN | [2012/31] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE ELECTRODES | [2012/31] | French: | ÉLECTRODES À HAUTES PERFORMANCES | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 16.11.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 10.01.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP12193805.4 / EP2562852 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2007004728 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 15 - line 20 * * page 3, line 14 - line 26 * * page 5, line 11 - line 15 * * page 5, line 25 - line 26 * * page 6, line 7 - line 21 * * page 15, line 23 - line 25 * * page 17, line 17 - line 23 * * page 23, line 19 - line 28 * * page 29, line 19 - line 21 * * page 34, line 18 - page 36, line 16 * * examples 1-7 * [I] 2; | [XI]EP1583168 (MOLTECH CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0096] * * example 3 * [I] 2; | [X]WO2008115168 (A123 SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0081] *; | [X]US2009226635 (LEBLANC PATRICK [CA], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]WO0036674 (MOLTECH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * example 9 *; | [X]WO2008138003 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * claims 13, 14 *; | [X]US2004160156 (OHATA TSUMORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US2006154141 (SALOT RAPHAEL [FR], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0051] * | by applicant | US7794877 | US20080069793 | US20080258854 |