EP2473581 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR USING OXYGEN IN THE STEAM REFORMING OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetzlaff, Karl-Heinz Mörikestr. 6 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10757567.2 | 03.09.2010 | WO2010EP05408 | Priority number, date | DE20091039920 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009039920 | [2012/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011026630 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2473581 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10B47/24, C10J3/66, F23C10/18, C10J3/50, C10J3/80, H05B3/64, B01J8/28, B01J8/00, B01J8/18, C10B53/02 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
B01J8/0055 (EP,KR,US);
C10J3/80 (EP,KR,US);
F23C10/00 (KR,US);
B01J8/009 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/1818 (EP,KR,US);
B01J8/28 (EP,KR,US);
C10J3/503 (EP,KR,US);
C10J3/66 (EP,KR,US);
F23C10/20 (EP,KR,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2208/00513 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00522 (EP,US);
C10J2200/09 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0956 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0959 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1276 (EP,US);
F23C2700/043 (US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NUTZUNG VON SAUERSTOFF BEI DER DAMPFREFORMIERUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2012/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR USING OXYGEN IN THE STEAM REFORMING OF BIOMASS | [2012/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR UTILISER DE L'OXYGÈNE DANS LE REFORMAGE À LA VAPEUR DE BIOMASSE | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 22.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.10.2018 | 10.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/34] | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3341648 (MOLSTEDT BYRON V, et al) [X] 1-7,11-15 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, lines 23-28 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, lines 60-68 * [I] 8-10,16; | [YA]JP2001235129 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 2-15; | [YA]US4982068 (POLLOCK JAMES F [GB], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 3 * [A] 2-16; | [YA]US5117482 (HAUBER DAVID E [US]) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 44 * [A] 2-16 | Examination | WO0125371 | by applicant | DE10242594 | DE19807988 | DE102008014799 | DE102008032166 |