EP2415529 - CARBON DIOXIDE COATING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states Kami Electronic Industry Co., Ltd. 6, Aza Simonome Ikazuchikita Kami-machi Kami-gun Miyagi 981-4302 / JP | [2017/31] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kami Electronic Industry Co., Ltd. 6 Aza Simonome Ikazuchikita Kami-machi Kami-gun Miyagi 981-4302 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Akira c/o Tohoku Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-1, Nigatake 4-chome, Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 983-8551 / JP | 02 /
KAWASAKI, Shin-ichiro c/o Tohoku Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-1, Nigatake 4-chome, Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 983-8551 / JP | 03 /
HAYASAKA, Noriaki c/o Kami Electronic Industry Co., Ltd. 6, Aza Simonome Ikazuchikita Kami-machi Kami-gun Miyagi 981-4302 / JP | [2017/35] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Akira c/o Tohoku Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-1 Nigatake 4-chome, Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 983-8551 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWASAKI, Shin-ichiro c/o Tohoku Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-1 Nigatake 4-chome, Miyagino-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 983-8551 / JP | |||
03 /
HAYASAKA, Noriaki c/o Kami Electronic Industry Co. Ltd. 6 Aza Simonome Ikazuchikita Kami-machi Kami-gun Miyagi 981-4302 / JP | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/35] |
Former [2012/06] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10758269.4 | 30.03.2010 | [2017/35] | WO2010JP02336 | Priority number, date | JP20090088479 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009088479 | JP20090088501 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009088501 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113489 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415529 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2415529 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, B01F5/00, B05B7/04, C09D201/00, B01F5/02, B01F3/04, C09D7/00 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
B05B7/0483 (EP,US);
B01F25/23 (EP,US);
B01F23/2132 (EP,US);
B01F25/105 (EP,US);
C09D7/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | B05D1/02, B01F5/00, B05B7/04, C09D201/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFDIOXIDBESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2012/06] | English: | CARBON DIOXIDE COATING METHOD AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2012/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION DE REVÊTEMENT À DIOXYDE DE CARBONE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | Translation filed | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 25.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2010 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | IT | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 30.03.2018 | LU | 30.03.2018 | MT | 30.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 30.03.2010 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
MT | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2018 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
IT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0420181 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-12,16,17 * abstract * * page 7, lines 45-58 * * page 8, lines 25-36 * * claims 1,2,5,8,10,11,12,17,38,45-49 * [I] 3,4,13-15; | [X]EP0595521 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-12,16,17 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 40 * * claims 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]EP0605137 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8,11,12,16,17 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 43 * * column 4, lines 24-45 * * column 6, lines 36-41 * * column 13, line 16 - column 14, line 27 * * claims 1,2,3,8 *; | [X]EP0321607 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-4,52 * | International search | [Y]JPH0657336B (UNION CARBIDE CORP.); | [Y]JPH0838979 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004000833 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JPS58107165 (ADAMU MIYUURAA); | [Y]JP2008012453 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [Y]JPH06228473 (NORDSON CORP) | by applicant | JPH01258770 | JPH0261845 | JP2670904B | JP2785099B | JP2739548B | JP2807927B |