EP2416090 - MULTIPLE AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES THERMAL SYSTEMS, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/49] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Tatsuhiro C/O Air-Conditioning&Refrigeration Systems Headquarters MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-1 Asahi, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8561 / JP | 02 /
ISOZUMI, Shinichi C/O Air-Conditioning&Refrigeration Systems Headquarters MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-1 Asahi, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8561 / JP | 03 /
MITOMA, Keisuke C/O Air-Conditioning&Refrigeration Systems Headquarters MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-1 Asahi, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi Aichi 452-8561 / JP | 04 /
MAENO, Masashi C/O NAGOYA Research&Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1 Aza Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 453-8515 / JP | 05 /
WATANABE, Satoshi C/O NAGOYA Research&Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1 Aza Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 453-8515 / JP | 06 /
UEFUJI, Yoichi C/O NAGOYA Research&Development Center MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 1 Aza Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 453-8515 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10758493.0 | 24.03.2010 | WO2010JP55063 | Priority number, date | JP20090083370 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009083370 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113719 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416090 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, F25B13/00, F24F11/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,US);
F25B41/37 (EP,US);
F25B41/385 (EP,US);
F25B41/39 (EP,US);
F24F11/84 (EP);
F25B2313/005 (EP);
F25B2313/006 (EP);
F25B2313/0233 (EP);
F25B2313/02741 (EP);
F25B2500/01 (EP);
F25B2500/06 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | F25B1/00, F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | MEHRFACH-KLIMAANLAGE | [2012/06] | English: | MULTIPLE AIR CONDITIONER | [2012/06] | French: | CLIMATISEUR A UNITES MULTIPLES | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | Translation filed | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4238531 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [I]JP2000220891 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008093538 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2000220891 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH11211255 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]JP2004286329 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2008185292 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | Examination | US2004216477 | by applicant | JP2008185292 |