EP2415994 - VEHICLE SPEED LIMITER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TETSUKA, Takashi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
MACHIDA, Kenichi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
ASADA, Yukihiro c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Masanori c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Beder, Jens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10758796.6 | 31.03.2010 | [2016/40] | WO2010JP55874 | Priority number, date | JP20090087261 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009087261 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114025 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2415994 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2415994 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02D29/02, B60K31/00, F02D9/02, F02D41/14, B60W30/16, B60W30/14 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
B60K31/04 (EP,US);
B60W30/146 (EP,US);
F02D11/02 (EP,US);
F02D29/02 (EP,US);
F02D31/006 (EP,US);
F02D9/02 (EP,US);
F02D9/109 (EP,US);
F02M35/10039 (EP,US);
F02M35/116 (EP,US);
F02M35/162 (EP,US);
B60K2031/0091 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0009 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0605 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | F02D29/02, B60K31/00, F02D9/02, F02D41/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGGESCHWINDIGKEITSBEGRENZER | [2012/06] | English: | VEHICLE SPEED LIMITER | [2012/06] | French: | LIMITEUR DE VITESSE DE VÉHICULE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2011 | Translation filed | 29.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 04.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2010 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | GB | 31.03.2017 | IE | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | LU | 31.03.2017 | MT | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
GB | 31.03.2017 | ||
IE | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
MT | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
GB | 31.03.2017 | ||
IE | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
MT | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
GB | 31.03.2017 | ||
IE | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
MT | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
GB | 31.03.2017 | ||
IE | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
MT | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
GB | 31.03.2017 | ||
IE | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5638277 (NAGAI MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1,3-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US7315779 (RIOUX ROGER [CA], et al) [A] 1,3-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1961605 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0110]; figures 9,10; claims 1-8 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0099] *; | [A]DE202008013233U (NIEMERG STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1,3-12* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH01110849 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]JPH02196146 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004116760 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JP2006104953 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH07197839 |