EP2416424 - SOLID ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1 Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGEZUMI Tsukasa c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 02 /
OOE Toshiharu c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 03 /
TSUCHIYA Katsuhisa c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 04 /
NAKANO Kiyotaka c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 05 /
KAWAMURA Yoshiyuki c/o TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2012/06] | Witte, Weller & Partner Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10758818.8 | 31.03.2010 | [2016/18] | WO2010JP55914 | Priority number, date | JP20090087231 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009087231 | [2012/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114047 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416424 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416424 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/12 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04589 (EP,US);
H01M8/04619 (EP,US);
H01M8/0494 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTELEKTROLYT-BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2012/06] | English: | SOLID ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL | [2012/06] | French: | PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2011 | Translation filed | 19.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 27.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2015 | 14.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2010 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.03.2010 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19523260 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * claim 4 *; | [A]US2007224471 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH053041 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2003217627 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2004164909 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2006244821 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2007087756 (TOTO LTD); | [A]JP2008159362 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | JP2003217627 | JP2007087756 |