EP2413832 - EYE THERAPY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avedro, INC. 230 Third Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, David 87 Chestnut Street Boston MA 02108 / US | 02 /
RYAN, Thomas 284 Bishops Forest Drive Waltham MA 02452 / US | 03 /
SCHARF, Ronald 114 Amherst Road Waltham MA 02451 / US | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Carter, Stephen John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10759492.1 | 02.04.2010 | WO2010US29812 | Priority number, date | US20090166009P | 02.04.2009 Original published format: US 166009 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115126 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2413832 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B18/1815 (EP,US);
A61F9/007 (EP,US);
A61F9/0079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | AUGENTHERAPIESYSTEM | [2012/06] | English: | EYE THERAPY SYSTEM | [2012/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE THÉRAPIE OCULAIRE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 06.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004111086 (TREMBLY B STUART [US]); | [Y]US6749604 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) |