EP2484078 - Method for securizing the execution of a NFC application installed in a secure element integrated in a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/32] | METHOD FOR SECURING THE EXECUTION OF AN ONBOARD NFC APPLICATION IN A SECURE ELEMENT FORMING AN INTEGRAL PART OF A MOBILE TERMINAL | ||
[2013/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMIEL, Patrice 53 Les Rives de Saint-Joseph F-13290 Aix-les-Milles / FR | 02 /
POUJOL, Stéphane 26 boulevard de Lavaux F-13600 La Ciotat / FR | 03 /
MARTIN, Michel, René 55 chemin de Coutran F-13720 La Bouilladisse / FR | 04 /
BERNABEU, Gil 576 route d'aubagne F-13420 Gemenos / FR | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 10759662.9 | 29.09.2010 | WO2010EP64509 | Priority number, date | EP20090305920 | 30.09.2009 Original published format: EP 09305920 | [2012/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011039288 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484078 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484078 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3227 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04W12/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Sicherung der Durchführung einer NFC-Anwendung in einem gesicherten Element eines mobilen Endgeräts | [2014/16] | English: | Method for securizing the execution of a NFC application installed in a secure element integrated in a mobile terminal | [2014/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCURISATION DE L'EXÉCUTION D'UNE APPLICATION NFC EMBARQUÉE DANS UN ÉLÉMENT SÉCURISÉ FAISANT PARTIE INTÉGRANTE D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/32] | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG DER AUSFÜHRUNG EINER NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSANWENDUNG AN BORD BEI EINEM SICHEREN ELEMENT ALS INTEGRIERTER BESTANDTEIL EINES MOBILEN ENDGERÄTS | ||
Former [2012/32] | METHOD FOR SECURING THE EXECUTION OF AN ONBOARD NFC APPLICATION IN A SECURE ELEMENT FORMING AN INTEGRAL PART OF A MOBILE TERMINAL | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2010 | AL | 27.08.2014 | AT | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | IE | 29.09.2014 | LU | 29.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MK | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
LU | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
IE | 29.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]CN101291494 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 1-11; | [A] - MARIE REVEILHAC ET AL, "Promising Secure Element Alternatives for NFC Technology", NEAR FIELD COMMUNICATION, 2009. NFC '09. FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090224), ISBN 978-0-7695-3577-7, pages 75 - 80, XP031500082 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 77, paragraph D * * page 78, paragraph IV - page 79, paragraph V * | by applicant | CN101291494 |