EP2482674 - CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITIONS HAVING A GREATER IMPACT ON THE INSULINEMIC RESPONSE THAN ON THE GLYCEMIC RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2018/15] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Roquette Freres 62136 Lestrem / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Liuming 3298 Hillcrest Road Geneva IL 60134 / US | 02 /
PARADY, Tom 1154 Wintergreen Terrace Batavia IL 60510 / US | 03 /
PERERA, Chandani 880 North Forest Avenue Batavia IL 60510 / US | 04 /
GERHARDT, Robert 976 East County Road 150 Sutter IL 62373 / US | 05 /
WILS, Daniel 14 Lotissement Le Village F-59190 Morbecque / FR | 06 /
BAUMANN, Dominique 615 Oak Lane South Elgin IL 60177 / US | 07 /
DEGRAVE-SANIEZ, Marie-Hélène 2 rue de Thionville F-59800 Lille / FR | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Gallois, Valérie Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand F-75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10759884.9 | 28.09.2010 | [2018/15] | WO2010EP64298 | Priority number, date | US20090571684 | 01.10.2009 Original published format: US 571684 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011039151 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482674 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2482674 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/52, A23L7/126, A23L33/21, A23L29/30 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,KR,US);
A23L29/35 (EP,KR,US);
A23L7/126 (EP,KR,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/328, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | A23L1/09, A23L1/164, A23L1/308, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENHYDRATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT GRÖSSERER WIRKUNG AUF DIE INSULINÄMISCHE REAKTION ALS AUF DIE GLYKÄMISCHEN REAKTION | [2012/32] | English: | CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITIONS HAVING A GREATER IMPACT ON THE INSULINEMIC RESPONSE THAN ON THE GLYCEMIC RESPONSE | [2012/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS GLUCIDIQUES AYANT UN PLUS GRAND IMPACT SUR LA RÉPONSE INSULINÉMIQUE QUE SUR LA RÉPONSE GLYCÉMIQUE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 30.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | IE | 28.09.2018 | LU | 28.09.2018 | MT | 28.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
MT | 28.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
MT | 28.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
MT | 28.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
MT | 28.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2152351 (SPECIALIST DAIRY INGREDIENTS) [X] 1,3,14,15 * example 1; claims 1-14 *; | [A]EP0561090 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0905256 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1006128 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1582102 (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,14,15 * examples 5,12; claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO2008054193 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,14,15 * examples 1,4; claims 1,6 *; | [X]WO2008101924 (GERVAIS DANONE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * example 3; claims 1,7,15-20 *; | [X]EP1982601 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1,3,14,15 * column 46; example 1; claims 1-22 *; | [A]WO2009088493 (CORN PRODUCTS INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X] - WOLF AT AL., "Glycemic response to a rapidly digested starch is not affected by the addition of an indigestible dextrin in humans", NUTRITION RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0271-5317, pages 1099 - 1106, XP002620712 [X] 1,3,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0271-5317(01)00327-X | [X] - ROZAN ET AL., "impact of suhar replacers on cognitive performance and function in rats", THE BRITISH NUTRITION, (200811), vol. 100, no. 5, pages 1004 - 1010, XP002620713 [X] 1,3,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0007114508971294 | by applicant | EP0443789 | EP0875585 | EP1006128 | WO2004068966 | - KOHMOTO T.; FUKUI F.; TAKAKU H.; MACHIDA Y. ET AL., BIFIDOBACTERIA MICROFLORA, (1988), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 61 - 69 | - KOHMOTO K.; TSUJI K.; KANEKO T.; SHIOTA M. ET AL., BIOSC. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 937 - 940 | - KANEKO T; KOHMOTO T.; KIKUCHI H.; FUKUI F. ET AL., NIPPON NOGEIKAGAKU KAISHI, (1992), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 1211 - 1220 | - PARK J-H; JIN-YOUNG Y.; OK-HO S.; HYUN-KYUNG S.; KOR. J. ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 237 - 242 |