EP2483617 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LIQUEFYING AND STORING A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 09.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUQUEYRE, Laurent P.O. Box 3001 345 Scarborough Road Briarcliff Manor New York 10510-8001 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 10760000.9 | 17.08.2010 | WO2010IB53717 | Priority number, date | US20090246175P | 28.09.2009 Original published format: US 246175 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011036580 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2483617 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25J1/02 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
F25J1/0248 (EP,US);
F25J1/0017 (EP,US);
F25J1/0251 (EP,US);
F25J1/0262 (EP,US);
F25J2205/40 (EP,US);
F25J2205/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERFLÜSSIGUNG UND SPEICHERUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2012/32] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LIQUEFYING AND STORING A FLUID | [2012/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE LIQUÉFACTION ET DE STOCKAGE D'UN FLUIDE | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 24.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/15] | 08.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2018 | 04.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0057118 (WISSOLIK ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 12; figure 3 *; | [XY]WO2004065869 (LNG INTERNAT PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * page 5, line 4 - line 7; figure 2 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2006000223 (DICKERSON BRIAN E [US]) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0006] , [0022] , [0023] , [0026]; figure 1 * | Examination | US5551256 |