EP2473658 - CELLULOSE FIBRES HAVING AN IMPROVED DOSING ABILITY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF FOR REINFORCING COMPOSITE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenzing AG Werkstrasse 2 4860 Lenzing / AT | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOBL, Markus Innerwall 7a A-5164 Seeham / AT | 02 /
INNERLOHINGER, Josef Rubensdorf 10 A-4880 Berg im Attergau / AT | 03 /
SUCHOMEL, Friedrich Trattberg 17 A-4861 Schörfling / AT | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Hanemann, Otto Lenzing AG Werkstraße 2 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 10760208.8 | 27.07.2010 | WO2010AT00274 | Priority number, date | AT20090001388 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: AT 13882009 | AT20100000286 | 24.02.2010 Original published format: AT 2862010 | [2012/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011026160 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473658 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2473658 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D01F2/00, C08K7/02, C08J5/04, D06M101/06 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
C08J5/045 (EP,CN,US);
C08K7/02 (AT);
D01F2/00 (EP,CN,US);
B32B17/04 (AT);
C08L23/12 (CN);
D01D5/26 (EP,CN,US);
D01G1/04 (EP,CN,US);
D01G13/00 (EP,US);
D01G7/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08J2323/02 (US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L1/02 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CELLULOSEFASERN MIT VERBESSERTER DOSIERFÄHIGKEIT, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG VON VERBUNDMATERIALIEN | [2012/28] | English: | CELLULOSE FIBRES HAVING AN IMPROVED DOSING ABILITY, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF FOR REINFORCING COMPOSITE MATERIALS | [2012/28] | French: | FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES À CAPACITÉ DE DOSAGE AMÉLIORÉE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION AINSI QUE LEUR UTILISATION POUR RENFORCER DES MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2010 | AL | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IE | 27.07.2014 | LU | 27.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MK | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1674146 (KHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * Stoff G;;; table 1 * * Stoff G;;; table 2 *; | [X]WO02058841 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * example 1 *; | [XI]GB2403223 (EXCEL IND LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 11 - line 13 * * example - * * claim - * [I] 1-9; | [XI]DE10337009 (CASETECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0030] * * examples 1-6 * [I] 1-9; | [XI]DE19517763 (RHODIA AG RHONE POULENC [DE]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,6 * [I] 1-9; | [A]DE102007028531 (JOHNS MANVILLE EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * | Examination | - JONG H LEE ET AL, "Assembly of synthetic cellulose I", BIOCHEMISTRY,, (19940802), vol. 91, pages 7425 - 7429, XP001320215 | - SHIRO KOBAYASHI, "Challenge of synthetic cellulose", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (20050101), vol. 43, no. 4, doi:10.1002/pola.20662, ISSN 0887-624X, pages 693 - 710, XP055054908 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pola.20662 | by applicant | WO2006060835 |