EP2467699 - ANALYSIS DEVICE WITH TRANSDUCER STIFFENING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivacta Limited 100 Guillat Avenue Kent Science Park Sittingbourne Kent ME9 8GU / GB | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAGHAN, Paul Brendan 7 Emerald Crescent Sittingbourne Kent ME10 5JJ / GB | 02 /
ROSS, Steven Andrew 4 Fairfield Terrace Hamstreet Ashford Kent TN26 2HS / GB | 03 /
CARTER, Timothy Joseph Nicholas 99 Wards Hill Road Minster-on-Sea Sheerness Kent ME12 2LH / GB | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2012/26] | Anderson, James Edward George Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10760386.2 | 01.09.2010 | WO2010GB51436 | Priority number, date | GB20090015338 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: GB 0915338 | US20090239976P | 04.09.2009 Original published format: US 239976 P | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027148 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467699 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2467699 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G01N25/48, G01N29/02, G01N29/24 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
G01N29/222 (EP,US);
G01N21/171 (GB);
G01N21/8483 (EP,US);
G01N25/48 (US);
G01N25/482 (EP,GB,US);
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSATOR MIT WANDLERVERSTEIFUNGSELEMENTEN | [2013/51] | English: | ANALYSIS DEVICE WITH TRANSDUCER STIFFENING ELEMENTS | [2012/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE AVEC ÉLÉMENTS DE RAIDISSEMENT DE TRANSDUCTEUR | [2012/26] |
Former [2012/26] | ANALYSATOR MIT WANDLERVERSTEIFUNGSELEMENTEN | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2010 | AL | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | IE | 01.09.2014 | LU | 01.09.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.09.2010 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IE | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 01.09.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5622868 (CLARKE DAVID J [GB], et al); | [AD]WO2004090512 (PIEZOPTIC LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO2009027726 (VIVACTA LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5622868 | WO2004090512 |