|
03.08.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.02.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2011 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.08.2011 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.08.2011 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |