19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
28.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.05.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.04.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
05.04.2015 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 06.05.2015 [2015/19] |
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
31.03.2015 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.03.2015 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2015 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
31.03.2015 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2015 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
20.03.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.11.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
First examination report |
|
27.08.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
14.12.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
10.12.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.07.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
20.07.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
15.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|