EP2467857 - DATA COMMUNICATION CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 8, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEHNER, Thomas 10 rue Croisy F-08000 Charleville Mézières / FR | 02 /
DROGUEST, Tony 18 rue Eva Thomé F-08500 Revin / FR | 03 /
ROUTA, Gilles 5 ruelle des Cerisiers F-08200 Sedan / FR | 04 /
ROFIDAL, Patrick 140 rue Jules Guesde F-08170 Fumay / FR | 05 /
GALLET, Jean-François Neuville Lez Beaulieu Pont d'Ang F-08380 Signy-le-petit / FR | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Gauer, Pierre, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Gauer, Pierre, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 10761050.3 | 12.08.2010 | WO2010FR51704 | Priority number, date | FR20090055706 | 19.08.2009 Original published format: FR 0955706 | [2012/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020967 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467857 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/04 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
H01B11/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01B11/1891 (KR);
H01B7/0876 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSKABEL | [2012/26] | English: | DATA COMMUNICATION CABLE | [2012/26] | French: | CÂBLE DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2017/11] |
Former [2012/26] | CABLE DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 29.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09259655 (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 2,7 * abstract *; | [A]WO02103715 (PIRELLI CABLES AU LTD [AU], et al) [A] 2,7 * page 2, lines 19-25 * * page 13, lines 15-31; figure 4 *; | [A]US2003111241 (BAHLMANN CRAIG [US], et al) [A] 9,10 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; figure 16 *; | [Y]US2004035603 (CLARK WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0042] - [0044] - [0047]; figure 6 * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057]; figures 14,15 *; | [A]US2005087361 (HAYES TRENT [US], et al) [A] 6* paragraph [0054]; figure 11 *; | [A]WO2005078745 (CABLE DESIGN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 2,7 * page 2, lines 14-30 * * page 4, lines 30-32 * * page 5, lines 10-25; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 16-25; figure 2; table 1 * * page 10, lines 1-15 *; | [A]EP1688968 (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 3-6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0019] , [0020] *; | [A]EP1848007 (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; figures 7,8 *; | [YP]US2010116522 (NEVETT JONATHAN [BE], et al) [YP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0010] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0054]; figure 3 * |