EP2409254 - AN EMISSION MONITORING AND TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND THE METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logica Private Limited Divyasree Technopolis 124-125, Yemlur Main Road Yemlur P.O. Off Airport Road Bangalore 560 037 / IN | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GURBRINDER, Singh, Bindra Logica Private Limited Divyasree Technopolis 124-125, Yemlur Main Road Yemlur P.O. Off Airport Road Bangalore 560 037 / IN | 02 /
PADMALAYAM, Narayana, Kurup, Ajith, Kumar LogicaPrivate Limited Divyasree Technopolis 124-125, Yemlur Main Road Yemlur P.O. Off Airport Road Bangalore 560 037 / IN | 03 /
SHANMUGASUNDARAM, Murugesan Logica Private Limited Divyasree Technopolis 124-125, Yemlur Main Road Yemlur P.O. Off Airport Road Bangalore 560 037 / IN | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 10761279.8 | 17.02.2010 | WO2010IN00091 | Priority number, date | INCH03732009 | 20.02.2009 Original published format: IN CH03732009 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010116381 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409254 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G01M15/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | EMISSIONSÜBERWACHUNGS- UND MELDUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/04] | English: | AN EMISSION MONITORING AND TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND THE METHOD THEREOF | [2012/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉMISSIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 27.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/19] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2013 | 28.02.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006009889 (BERNARD LEE [US]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1,4,5,8,10 *; | [Y]US2007179683 (OKEKE LOTENNA [GB]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0015] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035] , [0045]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3973848 (JOWETT TERENCE W, et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 66; figures 1,10,11 * * column 14, line 25 - column 15, line 10 * * column 17, lines 8-48 *; | [A]WO9837405 (ENVIROTEST SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 32, line 24 - page 33, line 14 *; | [A]GB2410560 (TECHNICAL CONCEPT SOLUTIONS LT [GB]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US3973848 (JOWETT TERENCE W, et al); | [Y]US2007179683 (OKEKE LOTENNA [GB]); | [A]US4160373 (FASTAIA ANTHONY J, et al); | [A]US5835871 (SMITH MARY V [US], et al); | [A]US6732032 (BANET MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [A]US6928348 (LIGHTNER BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US2003130774 (TRIPATHI PRADEEP R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006009889 |