17.09.2021 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
14.09.2021 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
23.07.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
27.06.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
02.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
15.12.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
09.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
04.01.2019 |
Opposition withdrawn |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
18.07.2017 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
16.06.2017 |
Opposition filed |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
12.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
12.08.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.08.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2015 |
First examination report |
|
24.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
01.11.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
22.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
13.01.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
12.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|