EP2416793 - A PLANT EXTRACT COMPRISING STATINS AND PREPARATION TECHNIQUES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | A plant extract comprising statins and preparation techniques and uses thereof | ||
[2021/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanyang Polytechnic 180 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8 Singapore 569830 / SG | For all designated states Eu Yan Sang International Ltd 21 Tai Seng Drive Singapore 535223 / SG | [2015/46] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Nanyang Polytechnic 180 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8 Singapore 569830 / SG | ||
For all designated states Eu Yan Sang International LTD 269A South Bridge Road Singapore 058818 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOH, Heng, Meng 106 Tai Keng Gardens Singapore 535387 / SG | 02 /
LEE, Mun, Kin, Joel 43 Hindhede Walk 02-09, Southaven 1 Singapore 587973 / SG | 03 /
LEUNG, Pak, Ho, Henry Blk 168 Ang Mo Kio Avenue 8, 07-01 Singapore 569830 / SG | 04 /
GURUSAMY, Subramaniam Blk 836 Woodlands Street 83, 09-133 Singapore 730836 / SG | 05 /
FUNG, Wai, To 81 Meng Suan Road Singapore 779301 / SG | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/42] |
Former [2012/07] | Jones, Elizabeth Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10761948.8 | 08.04.2010 | [2021/42] | WO2010SG00142 | Priority number, date | US20090167543P | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 167543 P | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010117342 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416793 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416793 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/00, A61K36/062, A61P3/06, A61K31/22, A61K36/48, A61K31/365, A61K36/899 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K36/062 (US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZENEXTRAKT MIT STATINEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2012/07] | English: | A PLANT EXTRACT COMPRISING STATINS AND PREPARATION TECHNIQUES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/22] | French: | EXTRAIT VÉGÉTAL COMPRENANT DES STATINES, SES TECHNIQUES DE PRÉPARATION ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2021/22] |
Former [2012/07] | A plant extract comprising statins and preparation techniques and uses thereof | ||
Former [2012/07] | Extrait végétal comprenant des statines, ses techniques de préparation et ses utilisations | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 01.11.2012 | Observations by third parties | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2010 | AT | 20.10.2021 | CY | 20.10.2021 | CZ | 20.10.2021 | DK | 20.10.2021 | EE | 20.10.2021 | ES | 20.10.2021 | FI | 20.10.2021 | HR | 20.10.2021 | IT | 20.10.2021 | LT | 20.10.2021 | LV | 20.10.2021 | MC | 20.10.2021 | MK | 20.10.2021 | MT | 20.10.2021 | NL | 20.10.2021 | PL | 20.10.2021 | RO | 20.10.2021 | SE | 20.10.2021 | SI | 20.10.2021 | SK | 20.10.2021 | SM | 20.10.2021 | TR | 20.10.2021 | BG | 20.01.2022 | NO | 20.01.2022 | GR | 21.01.2022 | IS | 20.02.2022 | PT | 21.02.2022 | IE | 08.04.2022 | LU | 08.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
TR | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
MK | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CY | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 20.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
IT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
IE | 08.04.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
LU | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
MC | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SI | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
CZ | 20.10.2021 | ||
DK | 20.10.2021 | ||
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SK | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
EE | 20.10.2021 | ||
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
RO | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
SM | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
NO | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
NL | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
SE | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
GR | 21.01.2022 | ||
IS | 20.02.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
ES | 20.10.2021 | ||
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
HR | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
LV | 20.10.2021 | ||
PL | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
PT | 21.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
FI | 20.10.2021 | ||
LT | 20.10.2021 | ||
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 20.10.2021 | |
BG | 20.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 20.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - LEE CHUN-LIN ET AL, "A simple and rapid approach for removing citrinin while retaining monacolin K in red mold rice", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 55, no. 26, doi:10.1021/JF071640P, ISSN 0021-8561, (20071226), pages 11101 - 11108, (20071130), XP008125184 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf071640p | [X] - YII-LIH LIN ET AL, "Biologically active components and nutraceuticals in the Monascus-fermented rice: a review", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20071122), vol. 77, no. 5, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 965 - 973, XP019560781 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - HONG M Y ET AL, "Anticancer effects of Chinese red yeast rice versus monacolin K alone on colon cancer cells", JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL BIOCHEMISTRY, BUTTERWORTH PUBLISHERS, STONEHAM, GB, vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.JNUTBIO.2007.05.012, ISSN 0955-2863, (20080701), pages 448 - 458, (20080609), XP022710090 [X] 1-15 * page 449, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 450, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jnutbio.2007.05.012 | [T] - WAI TO FUNG ET AL, "Assessment of Extracts from Red Yeast Rice for Herb-Drug Interaction by in-vitro and in-vivo assays", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20120302), vol. 2, doi:10.1038/srep00298, XP055071670 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep00298 | International search | [X]US4323648 (TANZAWA KAZUHIKO, et al); | [X]US5202029 (HAYTKO PETER N [US], et al); | [X]US6387258 (KERI VILMOS [HU], et al); | [A]US2004018210 (HAJJAJ HASSAN [FR], et al); | [X]WO2005104864 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [X] - LEE, C ET AL., "A Simple and Rapid Approach for Removing Citrinin while Retaining Monacolin K in Red Mold Rice", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 55, no. 26, pages 11101 - 11108, XP008125184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf071640p | [A] - WANG, T ET AL., "Monascus Rice Products", ADVANCES IN FOOD AND NUTRITION RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 53, pages 123 - 159, XP009171268 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1043-4526(07)53004-4 |