EP2416857 - PLAYING CARD SHUFFLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bally Gaming, Inc. 6601 South Bermuda Road Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [2015/28] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states SHUFFLE MASTER, INC. 1106 Palms Airport Drive Las Vegas NV 89119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINES, Randy, D. 4056 South Madelia Street Spokane WA 99203 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 10761983.5 | 06.04.2010 | [2015/38] | WO2010US01032 | Priority number, date | US20090384732 | 07.04.2009 Original published format: US 384732 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010117446 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2416857 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2416857 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63F1/12 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A63F1/12 (EP,US);
A63F1/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELKARTENMISCHER | [2012/07] | English: | PLAYING CARD SHUFFLER | [2012/07] | French: | BATTEUR DE CARTES À JOUER | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 07.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12162796.2 / EP2500067 | EP16197961.2 / EP3153216 | EP19166074.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2010 | BE | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | TR | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | IE | 06.04.2016 | LU | 06.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.04.2010 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
MT | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.04.2010 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
TR | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.04.2010 | |
BE | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 06.04.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
LU | 06.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | DK | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US892389 (BELLOWS BENJAMIN F [US]) [I] 1-14 * page 1, lines 49-59 * * page 2, lines 38-55 * * page 2, lines 79-95; figures 1,2,5,6, *; | [I]US4586712 (LORBER HAROLD [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * column 4, lines 1-39 * * column 5, lines 51-58 * * sentences 50-67; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3618933 (ROGGENSTEIN EDWIN O, et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, lines 69-73 * * column 2, lines 3-10, * * column 2, lines 25-45; figures 1,7 *; | [A]WO9528210 (SINES & FORTE [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US892389 (BELLOWS BENJAMIN F [US]); | [Y]US4586712 (LORBER HAROLD [US], et al); | [Y]US3618933 (ROGGENSTEIN EDWIN O, et al); | [Y]US5584483 (SINES RANDY D [US], et al) | Examination | US5096197 |