EP2417182 - PROCESS FOR BETA-LACTONE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novomer, Inc. 950 Danby Road Suite 198 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Scott, D. C/o Novomer Inc. 950 Danby Road Suite 198 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 02 /
VALENTE, Ronald, R. C/o Novomer Inc. 950 Danby Road Suite 198 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 03 /
LEE, Han C/o Novomer Inc. 950 Danby Road Suite 198 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 04 /
CHERIAN, Anna, E. C/o Novomer Inc. 950 Danby Road Suite 198 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 05 /
BUNNING, Donald, L. 925 Woodland Avenue South Charleston WV 25303 / US | 06 /
CLINTON, Nye, A. 16 Christopher Drive Hurricane WV 25526 / US | 07 /
FRUCHEY, Olan, Stanley 13 Greenbrier Avenue Hurricane WV 25526 / US | 08 /
DOMBEK, Bernard, Duane 1620 Woodvale Drive Charleston WV 25314 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10762368.8 | 07.04.2010 | WO2010US30230 | Priority number, date | US20090286382P | 15.12.2009 Original published format: US 286382 P | US20100310257P | 03.03.2010 Original published format: US 310257 P | US20090167711P | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 167711 P | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010118128 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417182 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/82, C07D307/60, C07D305/12 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
C07D307/60 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D305/02 (KR);
C07D305/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C51/377 (US);
C07C231/14 (US);
C07C51/09 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/30 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/317 (US);
C08G63/08 (US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | C08G63/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BETA-LACTON | [2012/07] | English: | PROCESS FOR BETA-LACTONE PRODUCTION | [2012/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BÊTA-LACTONE | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2014 | Observations by third parties | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0577206 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [I] 1-17* Method of converting propylene oxide in diglyme and CO2(CO)8 and CO gas to beta-butyrolactone :;; examples 1-4; claims 1, 6 *; | [I]WO2004012860 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-17 * A method of reacting epoxides in a solvent comprising catalysts with CO gas to beta-lactones :;; claims 1-6; tables 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US2469704 (STONE HERBERT G); | [Y]US3326938 (LYLE WAGNER PHILIP); | [Y]US3751435 (VAN DER VEN S, et al); | [Y]US4590293 (PASCOE RALPH F [US]); | [Y]US4873378 (MURPHY MARK A [US], et al); | [Y]US6392078 (RYU J YONG [US], et al); | [Y]US6852865 (COATES GEOFFREY W [US], et al); | [Y]US6916951 (TUSTIN GERALD CHARLES [US], et al); | [Y]US2005222458 (CRACIUN LILIANA [US], et al); | [Y]US2007217965 (JOHNSON THOMAS E [US], et al); | [A]US2009124787 (PREISHUBER-PFLUGL PETER [DE], et al) | Examination | - "Poly-beta-hydroxybutyrate Pilot Plant Catalytic Synthesis of Biodegradable Polymer", 13.05.2005, David Janke, Laura Hamilton, Michael Hall, Briley Lambert | other | - JANKE D. ET AL, "POLY-BETA-HYDROXYBUTYRATE PILOT PLANT CATALYTIC SYNTHESIS OF A BIODEGRADABLE POLYMER", URL: HTTPS://WWW.CALVIN.EDU/ACADEMIC/ENGINEERING/SENIOR-DESIGN/SENIORDESIGN04-05/FINAL%20REPORTS/16-FINALREPORT.PDF, XP055180768 |