EP2417440 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A HOMEOSTATIC LOOP EMPLOYING AN APTAMER BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensor-Kinesis Corporation 6053 W. Century Blvd., Suite 1000 Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | For all designated states Shachar, Yehoshua 2417 22nd Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | For all designated states Wu, Winston 1000 S. 5th Street Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | For all designated states Farkas, Leslie 254 N. Arnaz Street Ojai, CA 93023 / US | For all designated states Chen, Thomas 5155 La Canada Blvd. La Canada, CA 91011 / US | [2017/05] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Pharmaco-Kinesis Corporation 10524 S. La Cienega Blvd. Inglewood, CA 90304 / US | ||
For all designated states Shachar, Yehoshua 2417 22nd Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | |||
For all designated states Wu, Winston 1000 S. 5th Street Alhambra, CA 91801 / US | |||
For all designated states Farkas, Leslie 254 N. Arnaz Street Ojai, CA 93023 / US | |||
For all designated states Chen, Thomas 5155 La Canada Blvd. La Canada, CA 91011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHACHAR, Yehoshua 2417 22nd Street Santa Monica CA 90405 / US | 02 /
WU, Winston 1000 S. 5th Street Alhambra CA 91801 / US | 03 /
FARKAS, Leslie 254 N. Arnaz Street Ojai CA 93023 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Thomas 5155 La Canada Blvd. La Canada CA 91011 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
SHACHAR, Yehoshua 3527 22nd Street Santa Monica CA 90405 / US | ||
02 /
WU, Winston 1000 S. 5th Street Alhambra CA 91801 / US | |||
03 /
FARKAS, Leslie 254 N. Arnaz Street Ojai CA 93023 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Thomas 5155 La Canada Blvd. La Canada CA 91011 / US | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2012/07] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10762472.8 | 09.04.2010 | [2016/49] | WO2010US30484 | Priority number, date | US20090422125 | 10.04.2009 Original published format: US 422125 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010118288 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2417440 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417440 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, G01N27/403, G01N27/327, G01N33/53, G01N27/00, G01N33/542, G01N33/543 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | G01N27/26, G01N27/403, G01N27/327, G01N33/53, G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FORMUNG EINER HOMÖOSTASE-SCHLEIFE MIT EINEM ADAPTAMER-BIOSENSOR | [2012/07] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING A HOMEOSTATIC LOOP EMPLOYING AN APTAMER BIOSENSOR | [2012/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA FORMATION D'UNE BOUCLE HOMÉOSTATIQUE UTILISANT UN BIOCAPTEUR APTAMÈRE | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2015 | 09.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2014 | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2010 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | IE | 09.04.2017 | LU | 09.04.2017 | MT | 09.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.04.2010 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - FANG WEI ET AL, "Aptamer-based electrochemical biosensor for Botulinum neurotoxin", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090224), vol. 393, no. 8, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 1943 - 1948, XP019702708 [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * page 1943, column r, paragraph 2 - page 1944, column l, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,12 | [YD] - LEE H S ET AL, "Electrical detection of VEGFs for cancer diagnoses using anti-vascular endotherial growth factor aptamer-modified Si nanowire FETs", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BIOS.2008.08.036, ISSN 0956-5663, (20090215), pages 1801 - 1805, (20080829), XP025922762 [YD] 4,12 * page 1803, column l, paragraph 1 - page 1805, column l, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2008.08.036 | International search | [X]US4822566 (NEWMAN ARNOLD L [US]); | [A]US2002012937 (TENDER LEONARD M [US], et al); | [Y]US2002185379 (SCHRENK WALTER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2006137981 (JOHNSEN KRISTINN [IS], et al); | [A]US2007151848 (NOVAK JAMES [US], et al) | by applicant | US20080143720 |