EP2480268 - ASSEMBLY AND INDICATOR FOR A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLUMPTRE, David 36 Shire Way Doritwich Spa Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB | 02 /
TERRY, Warren 4 Glendower Approach Warwick CV34 6ET / GB | 03 /
VEASEY, Robert 31 Lonsdale Road Lillington Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 7EP / GB | 04 /
JONES, Matthew 8 The Furr Marsh Warwick Warwickshire CV34 6DL / GB | 05 /
CLAUGHTON, Timothy Giles 18 High Low Avenue Congleton Cheshire CW12 2EP / GB | [2012/38] |
Former [2012/31] | 01 /
PLUMPTRE, David 36 Shire Way Doritwich Spa Worcestershire WR9 7RQ / GB | ||
02 /
TERRY, Warren 4 Glendower Approach Warwick CV34 6ET / GB | |||
03 /
VEASEY, Robert 31 Lonsdale Road Lillington Leamington Spa Warwickshire CV32 7EP / GB | |||
04 /
JONES, Matthew 8 The Furr Marsh Warwick Warwickshire CV34 6DL / GB | |||
05 /
CLAUGHTON, Timothy Giles c/o Sanofi-Aventis London Road Holmes Chapel Crewe Cheshire CW4 8BE / GB | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/31] | Application number, filing date | 10762886.9 | 21.09.2010 | [2016/33] | WO2010EP63842 | Priority number, date | EP20090171134 | 23.09.2009 Original published format: EP 09171134 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011036134 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2480268 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2480268 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/315 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
A61M5/3146 (EP,US);
A61M5/31555 (EP,US);
A61M5/31593 (US);
A61M2005/3125 (EP,US);
A61M2205/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | 23.04.2012 | ME | 23.04.2012 | RS | 23.04.2012 | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND ANZEIGER FÜR EINE ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND INDICATOR FOR A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2012/31] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE ET INDICATEUR POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2016/15] |
Former [2012/31] | ANORDNUNG UND INDIKATOR FÜR EINE WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2012/31] | ASSEMBLAGE ET INDICATEUR POUR DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 16.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | CY | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 17.08.2016 | |
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6030363 (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 11 - column 12; figures 20,25 *; | [A]US2007112299 (SMIT KAREN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0099] - [0100] *; | [A]US2007197976 (JACOBS ALEXANDER T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0041] *; | [X]WO2008154616 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0065] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0077] * |