EP2480637 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING TARS FROM SYNTHESIS GAS OBTAINED DURING GASIFICATION OF BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Energieonderzoek Centrum Nederland Westerduinweg 3 1755 LE Petten / NL | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZWART, Robin Willem Rudolf Spoorstraat 74 1815 BM Alkmaar / NL | 02 /
BOS, Alexander Scholeksterstraat 36 1873 HM Groet / NL | 03 /
KUIPERS, Johannes Mondriaanlaan 32 1701 TD Heerhugowaard / NL | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/31] | Pallard, Caroline Chantal Patricia Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10763051.9 | 24.09.2010 | WO2010NL50622 | Priority number, date | NL20092003547 | 25.09.2009 Original published format: NL 2003547 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011037463 | Date: | 31.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2480637 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2480637 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/18, C10J3/84 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
C10K1/18 (EP,US);
C10J3/84 (EP,KR,US);
C10J3/466 (EP,KR,US);
C10K1/024 (EP,KR,US);
C10K1/028 (EP,KR,US);
C10K1/046 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEERENTFERNUNG AUS SYNTHESEGAS AUS DER VERGASUNG VON BIOMASSE | [2012/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOVING TARS FROM SYNTHESIS GAS OBTAINED DURING GASIFICATION OF BIOMASS | [2012/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR ÉLIMINER DES GOUDRONS À PARTIR DU GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE OBTENU PENDANT LA GAZÉIFICATION D'UNE BIOMASSE | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IE | 24.09.2014 | LU | 24.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IE | 24.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
LU | 24.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB158915 (BARBET & FILS & CIE E) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]GB568593 (FOSTER WHEELER LTD, et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [ID]WO03018723 (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [ID] 1-13 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 9; figure 1; claims 1,3 * * page 5, line 6 - line 13 * * page 6, line 20 - line 30 * * page 8, line 1 - line 9 *; | [I]WO2008010717 (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 6, line 26 - page 10, line 20; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO03018723 | WO2008010717 |