EP2477743 - DISPOSABLE DEVICE FOR STORING BIOLOGICAL LIQUIDS AND USE THEREOF TO DETECT MATERIALS, PARTICLES, AND/OR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich, Hans-Werner Wiensenstrasse 40 17489 Griefswald / DE | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Baumbach, Friedrich Patentanwalt Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Baumbach, Friedrich Patentanwalt Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10 13125 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10763118.6 | 30.08.2010 | WO2010DE01002 | Priority number, date | DE20091041895 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009041895 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032530 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2477743 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01D33/01, A61B10/00, G01N33/49, G01N1/00, B01L3/14 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B01L3/50825 (EP,US);
A61B10/0096 (EP,US);
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (EP,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0672 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | EINWEG-VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFBEWAHRUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON STOFFEN, PARTIKEL UND/ODER ZELLEN | [2012/30] | English: | DISPOSABLE DEVICE FOR STORING BIOLOGICAL LIQUIDS AND USE THEREOF TO DETECT MATERIALS, PARTICLES, AND/OR CELLS | [2012/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF JETABLE DESTINÉ À CONSERVER DES LIQUIDES BIOLOGIQUES ET SON UTILISATION POUR DÉTECTER DES SUBSTANCES, PARTICULES ET/OU CELLULES. | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3586064 (BROWN PAUL A, et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US4210623 (BRENO PHILIP J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]US5077012 (GUIRGUIS RAOUF A [US]) [I] 1,4-7,12-18,22 * column 2, lines 44-46; figures 1-5 * * column 3, lines 46-50 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 18 *; | [XI]US5919356 (HOOD ROBERT GORDON [GB]) [X] 1,4-7,12-17,22 * column 1, lines 1-42; figures 7-9 * * column 2, lines 1-17 * * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 4 * [I] 18 |