EP2420182 - IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUKUSA Yutaka c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD. Hamamatsu Factory 1-3-1 Shinmiyakoda Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA Toshiaki c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD. Hamamatsu Factory 1-3-1 Shinmiyakoda Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K. Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 10764375.1 | 06.04.2010 | WO2010JP56193 | Priority number, date | JP20090098542 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009098542 | [2012/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010119790 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420182 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/14, G06T1/00, A61B3/10 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP,US);
A61B3/0025 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10101 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30041 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | A61B3/14, G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/08] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2012/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2011 | Translation filed | 14.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 07.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0067635 (APPLIED SPECTRAL IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * page 13, line 23 - line 24 * * page 15, line 2 * * page 21, line 26 - page 22, line 2 * * page 24, line 6 - line 8 * * page 35, line 20 - line 24 * * page 37, line 1 - line 6 * * page 39, line 11 - line 12 * * page 44, line 14 - line 27 * * page 91, line 1 - line 11 * * figures 2,12,13a-13c,21-22 * [Y] 3-7; | [Y]EP1723902 (YOKOHAMA TLO COMPANY LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] *; | [Y]WO02080759 (KERR PATRICK [GB], et al) [Y] 5 * page 10, line 21 - page 11, line 8 *; | [Y]JP2007252707 (UNIV GIFU, et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0029] * | [Y] - DELORI F C ET AL, "SPECTRAL REFLECTANCE OF THE HUMAN OCULAR FUNDUS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (19890315), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1364/AO.28.001061, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1061 - 1077, XP000029737 [Y] 4 * page 1076, column 1, line 11 - line 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.28.001061 | [Y] - M. PAQUES ET AL, "Panretinal, High-Resolution Color Photography of the Mouse Fundus", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (20070601), vol. 48, no. 6, doi:10.1167/iovs.06-1099, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 2769 - 2774, XP055049033 [Y] 6 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.06-1099 | International search | [A]JPH04276232 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2000245700 (NIDEK KK); | [A]JP2919855B (TOPCON CORP.) | by applicant | JP2000245700 | JP2919855B |