EP2419695 - DISPLACEMENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Ltd. 1191, Shinsang-Ri Jinryang-Eup Kyungsan-Si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 712-838 / KR | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chul Sub 262-1502 Boseong 1 cha Seohan Apt. Sinmae-dong Suseong-gu Daegu 706-170 / KR | 02 /
BYEON, Eul Chul 302-707 Hangaram Hanyang Apt. 1586 Gwanyang-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-060 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Beom Kyu 3-308 Ildu Apt. 1021 Seonghyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-055 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Young Deok 1501-1007 Jugong Apt. Sanggye 8-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-765 / KR | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [2018/04] |
Former [2012/08] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10764581.4 | 09.03.2010 | [2018/04] | WO2010KR01458 | Priority number, date | KR20090032423 | 14.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090032423 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010120042 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2419695 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419695 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/16, G01L1/22, G01D5/16 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
G01B7/18 (EP,US);
G01B7/16 (KR);
G01B7/00 (KR);
G01D5/16 (KR);
G01L1/22 (KR);
G01L1/2231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHIEBUNGSSENSOR | [2012/08] | English: | DISPLACEMENT SENSOR | [2012/08] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DÉPLACEMENT | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 25.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.12.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2010 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | ES | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | IT | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | IE | 09.03.2018 | LU | 09.03.2018 | MT | 09.03.2018 | FR | 24.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | GB | 24.04.2018 | NO | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.03.2010 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
FR | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
FR | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
MT | 09.03.2018 | ||
FR | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
FR | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 24.01.2018 | |
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5263375 (OKADA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 6, line 12 - column 23, line 6 *; | [X]DE102005036126 (ZEISS IND MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0055] - [0058] *; | [X]DE2608381 (HOTTINGER MESSTECHNIK BALDWIN) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,3-8 * * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 16 *; | [X]DE3238951 (ERICHSEN A M GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 9, line 19 - page 12, line 6 *; | [X]JP2005106775 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | International search | [X]KR20030040244 (KWON JANG WOO [KR]); | [Y]JPH02118203U (KYOWA DENGYO KK.); | [A]JPH04145304 (SAGINOMIYA SEISAKUSHO INC); | [A]JPS5866803 (SHINWA KK); | [A]JPS5895201 (KYOWA ELECTRONIC INSTRUMENTS) | by applicant | US5263375 | DE102005036126 | DE2608381 | JP2005106775 | DE3238951 |