EP2419268 - HIGH TEMPERATURE FIBER COMPOSITE BURNER SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZETA CORPORATION 2343 Calle del Mundo Santa Clara, CA 95054-1008 / US | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, John, D. 4363 Grover Drive Fremont CA 94536 / US | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/23] |
Former [2012/08] | Hart, Deborah Mary, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10764940.2 | 08.04.2010 | [2020/23] | WO2010US30435 | Priority number, date | US20090424457 | 15.04.2009 Original published format: US 424457 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010120628 | Date: | 21.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419268 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419268 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/14, B32B3/10 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
F23D14/147 (EP,KR,US);
F23D2212/103 (EP,KR,US);
F23D2212/201 (EP,KR,US);
F23D2213/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | B32B3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHE FÜR EINEN HOCHTEMPERATURVERBUNDBRENNER | [2012/08] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE FIBER COMPOSITE BURNER SURFACE | [2012/08] | French: | SURFACE DE BRÛLEUR COMPOSITE À FIBRE À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 20.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2010 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 08.04.2010 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5326631 (CARSWELL MARTIN G [US], et al) [YD] 9,10,16,18,19 * column 1, line 7 - line 15 ** column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 51 *; | [X]US5580505 (CARSWELL MARTIN G [US]) [X] 1,3,6-8,12-15,17,21,22,24 * column 2, line 10 - line 67 * * column 3, line 40 - line 45 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 11 * * column 7, line 44 - column 8, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XDYI]US5595816 (CARSWELL MARTIN G [US]) [XD] 1,3,6-8,12-15,17,21,22,24 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 41 - line 46 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 9 * * column 6, line 1 - line 17 * * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 33 * * figures 1-3; claims 1,3 * [Y] 9,10,16,18,19 [I] 2,4,5,11,20,23 | International search | [Y]US5326631 (CARSWELL MARTIN G [US], et al); | [X]US5595816 (CARSWELL MARTIN G [US]) | by applicant | US3954387 | US4504218 | US4673349 | US5326631 | US5595816 |