EP2485986 - DEVICE FOR CLEANING WASTEWATER COMPRISING CONTAMINANTS AND THAT CAN BE OR IS INSTALLED IN A WATERCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enveko GmbH Waldstraße 23 28844 Weyhe / DE | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN ZÜREN, Jens Waldstraße 23 28844 Weye / DE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10765420.4 | 06.10.2010 | WO2010EP64943 | Priority number, date | DE20092013628U | 07.10.2009 Original published format: DE 202009013628 U | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011042476 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2485986 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, B63J4/00, C02F3/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
C02F3/1242 (EP);
B63J4/006 (EP);
C02F2103/008 (EP);
C02F2201/001 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | IN EIN WASSERFAHRZEUG EINBAUBARE ODER EINGEBAUTE VORRICHTUNG ZUR REINIGUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN ENTHALTENDEM ABWASSER | [2012/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR CLEANING WASTEWATER COMPRISING CONTAMINANTS AND THAT CAN BE OR IS INSTALLED IN A WATERCRAFT | [2012/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION D'EAUX USÉES CONTENANT DES IMPURETÉS, MONTÉ OU POUVANT ÊTRE MONTÉ DANS UN BATEAU | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 22.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 16.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/44] | 13.06.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.09.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE20316374U (VOGT BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0020] , [0022] , [0025] , [0030]; figure . * [I] 5-10; | [XY]GB2224728 (SKILLING ANDREW JOHN) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 5-10; | [XI]WO03010097 (LE LOTHAIRE [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 * [I] 5-10; | [XY]DE102007030938 (INTEWA INGENIEUR GES FUER EN U [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0016] , [0064] - [0073] * [Y] 5-10; | [A]US2008110827 (COTE PIERRE L [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0116]; figure 20 *; | [A]US6752921 (KULICK III FRANK M [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1 - column 2 * | Examination | US4200534 | by applicant | DE19842332 |