03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
26.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
18.05.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
04.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.10.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
19.07.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
04.07.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|