EP2456578 - ROBOT FOR CLEANING AND INSPECTION OF CONDUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/22] | ROBOT FOR CLEANING AND INSPECTION OF CONDUITS AND ITS CONTROL UNIT | ||
[2016/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neovision, s.r.o. Barrandova 409 143 00 Praha 4 / CZ | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Neovision, s.r.o. Barrandova 409 143 00 Praha 4 / CZ | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Neovision, s.r.o. Cenetická 2/2218 149 00 Praha 4 / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARKAVEC, Petr Semnice-Sedlecko 34 okr.Karlovy Vary 36272 Semnice-Sedlecko / CZ | 02 /
SMUTNY, Vladimír K Noskovne 127 164 19 Praha 6 - Nebusice / CZ | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Hak, Roman Hak, Janecek & Svestka Patent and Trademark Attorneys U Pruhonu 5 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/33] | Duskova, Hana Czech Technical University in Prague Patent Centre Zikova 4 166 36 Praha 6 / CZ | ||
Former [2012/22] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10765934.4 | 20.07.2010 | [2016/29] | WO2010CZ00080 | Priority number, date | CZ20090000480 | 24.07.2009 Original published format: CZ 20090480 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009420 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2456578 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2456578 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/049, B62D55/065, B62D55/084 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B08B9/049 (EP,US);
B62D55/065 (EP,US);
B62D55/084 (EP,US);
B08B9/04 (US);
B08B9/0495 (US);
B08B9/0497 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | B08B9/049 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER ZUM REINIGEN UND INSPIZIEREN VON LEITUNGEN | [2016/29] | English: | ROBOT FOR CLEANING AND INSPECTION OF CONDUITS | [2016/09] | French: | ROBOT POUR LE NETTOYAGE ET L'INSPECTION DE CONDUITES | [2016/09] |
Former [2012/22] | ROBOTER ZUM REINIGEN UND PRÜFEN VON LEITUNGEN UND STEUEREINHEIT | ||
Former [2012/22] | ROBOT FOR CLEANING AND INSPECTION OF CONDUITS AND ITS CONTROL UNIT | ||
Former [2012/22] | ROBOT POUR LE NETTOYAGE ET L'INSPECTION DE CONDUITES ET SON UNITÉ DE COMMANDE | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2010 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IE | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LU | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 20.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.07.2010 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IY]GB2214263 (KUBOTA LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 3, line 7 - line 24 * * page 4, line 21 - page 12, line 12 * * page 16, line 3 - line 7 * * claim - * * figure - * [Y] 7,8; | [IY]US2002102136 (HOLLAND CAL [CA]) [I] 1-4,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * claim - * * figure - * [Y] 5,6; | [YA]EP1486755 (BREVAL TECHNICAL SERVICES LTD [GB]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,2,4,5,9; | [YA]GB2408340 (RADIODETECTION LTD [GB]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * page 1, line 21 - page 2, line 3 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 9 - line 11 * * page 5, line 23 - line 27 * * page 7, line 3 - line 8 * * claim - * * figure - *[A] 1-4,9; | [YA]US2008098834 (SERGOYAN EDWARD G [US], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * claim - * * figure - * [A] 1,2,4,5,7,9 | by applicant | EP0105418 | US5113885 | US5528789 | US5878783 | US6019048 | US6026538 | US6101951 | EP1054752 | JP2001096246 | US7210364 | CN1962091 | CN101069890 | CN101435522 |