EP2507035 - CONNECTION BETWEEN A FIRST COMPONENT AND A SECOND COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIER, Christoph Dreherstr. 14 76473 Iffezheim / DE | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/41] | Application number, filing date | 10766018.5 | 06.10.2010 | WO2010EP64873 | Priority number, date | DE20091047389 | 02.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009047389 | [2012/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011067014 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2507035 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/56, B29C65/64, B29C65/16, B29C65/08, B29C65/14, F16B3/00, F16B17/00, F16K31/06 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
B29C65/16 (EP);
B29C65/56 (EP);
B29C65/64 (EP);
B29C66/526 (EP);
B29C66/5268 (EP);
B29C66/532 (EP);
B29C66/61 (EP);
B29C66/742 (EP);
F16B3/005 (EP);
B29C2035/0822 (EP);
B29C65/08 (EP);
B29C65/14 (EP);
B29C65/1412 (EP);
B29C65/1632 (EP);
B29C65/609 (EP);
B29C66/1222 (EP);
B29C66/1224 (EP);
B29C66/21 (EP);
B29C66/30325 (EP);
B29C66/5261 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29L2031/7506 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM ERSTEN BAUTEIL UND EINEM ZWEITEN BAUTEIL | [2012/41] | English: | CONNECTION BETWEEN A FIRST COMPONENT AND A SECOND COMPONENT | [2012/41] | French: | LIAISON ENTRE UN PREMIER COMPOSANT ET UN SECOND COMPOSANT | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 11.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4106962 (ADAMS ROBERT CLARENCE, et al) [Y] 6,7* abstract *; | [XY]WO8002529 (INTERELECTRIC AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 3,7; | [Y]JPS6264528 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [XY]JPS63135231 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [X] 1,4,8,9 * abstract * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]WO0188422 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * pages 1-9; figures 1,3 * |