EP2477568 - LASER BEAM ALIGNING UNIT AND LASER TREATMENT DEVICE FOR TREATING A MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumera Laser GmbH Opelstr. 10 67661 Kaiserslautern / DE | For all designated states Kasenbacher, Anton Neuling 5 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states Lumera Laser GmbH Opelstr. 10 67661 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASENBACHER, Anton Neuling 5 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10766236.3 | 18.08.2010 | [2016/13] | WO2010DE75079 | Priority number, date | DE20091042199 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: DE102009042199 | [2012/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011032551 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2477568 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2477568 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20, A61C1/00 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
A61C1/0046 (EP,US);
A61B18/20 (US);
A61B2018/2005 (US);
A61B2018/20351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/20355 (EP,US);
A61B2018/206 (US);
A61B2218/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERSTRAHL-AUSRICHTEINHEIT UND LASERBEARBEITUNGSGERÄT ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES MATERIALS | [2012/30] | English: | LASER BEAM ALIGNING UNIT AND LASER TREATMENT DEVICE FOR TREATING A MATERIAL | [2012/30] | French: | UNITÉ D'ORIENTATION DE FAISCEAU LASER ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT LASER DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT D'UNE MATIÈRE | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2010 | AL | 30.03.2016 | BG | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | CZ | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | EE | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | HR | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | LT | 30.03.2016 | LV | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | MK | 30.03.2016 | MT | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | PL | 30.03.2016 | RO | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | SI | 30.03.2016 | SK | 30.03.2016 | SM | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | NO | 30.06.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | IS | 30.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | AT | 18.08.2016 | IE | 18.08.2016 | LU | 18.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
BG | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
AT | 18.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
MT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
AT | 18.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
TR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
AT | 18.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
MK | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
AT | 18.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
AT | 18.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SI | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 30.03.2016 | |
EE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
RO | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
SK | 30.03.2016 | ||
SM | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 30.03.2016 | |
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
PL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
IS | 30.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
LV | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
LT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
HR | 30.03.2016 | ||
NO | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]USRE37585E (MOUROU GERARD [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,8 * column 6, lines 52-60 *; | [XYI]US2004176718 (FIEDLER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11,13 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] * [Y] 3,5,8,9,14-16 [I] 12; | [Y]WO2005009267 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 9* page 8, lines 17-25 *; | [XY]WO2006074469 (OPTIMEDICA CORP [US], et al) [X] 17 * page 8, lines 11-23 * * page 14, lines 20-28 * * page 22, lines 19-27 * [Y] 14-16 | Examination | USRE37585E |