EP2486503 - PROCESSING AND DISPLAYING COMPUTER-AIDED DETECTION INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH BREAST X-RAY IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hologic, Inc. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREEGER, Kevin, A. 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
MARSHALL, Julian 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
HITZKE, Georgia 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 04 /
CHUI, Haili 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | de Baat, Michiel Anton, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | de Baat, Michiel Anton, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Toren, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2012/33] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 10766444.3 | 06.10.2010 | WO2010US51708 | Priority number, date | US20090249311P | 07.10.2009 Original published format: US 249311 P | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011044295 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2486503 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/463 (US);
A61B6/465 (US);
A61B6/502 (US);
G06F3/04815 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06T11/003 (US);
G06T11/008 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61B6/0414 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (EP,US);
A61B6/467 (EP,US);
A61B6/5217 (EP,US);
A61B6/5294 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20104 (US);
G06T2207/30068 (US);
G06T2207/30204 (US);
G06T2210/41 (EP,US);
G06T2211/436 (EP,US);
G06T2219/004 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG UND ANZEIGE VON COMPUTERUNTERSTÜTZTEN DETEKTIONSINFORMATIONEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT MAMMARÖNTGENBILDERN | [2012/33] | English: | PROCESSING AND DISPLAYING COMPUTER-AIDED DETECTION INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH BREAST X-RAY IMAGES | [2012/33] | French: | TRAITEMENT ET AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS DE DÉTECTION ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR, ASSOCIÉES À DES IMAGES RADIOLOGIQUES DU SEIN | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 12.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP12166712.5 / EP2535829 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02056240 (R2 TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 11-43 * figure 16 * * page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 2 *; | [A]US2007047793 (WU TAO [US], et al) [A] 56-76 * paragraph [0052] * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2007177780 (CHUI HAILI [US]) [A] 11-43 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0 22] - [0025] * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US7298877 (COLLINS MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 44-55 * column 1, lines 31-35 *; | [I]WO2008020062 (MEVIS BREASTCARE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [I] 44-76 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 8, lines 15-18 * * page 22, line 15 - page 28, line 23 * * page 30, lines 15-23 *; | [XYI]US2009034684 (BERNARD SYLVAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0036] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0059] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] * [Y] 11-43 [I] 4,6-10; | [YD]WO2009038948 (HOLOGIC INC [US], et al) [YD] 11-43 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 19] , [0 20] * * figures 1, 4 *; | [A] - CHI E H ED - ROTH S F ET AL, "A taxonomy of visualization techniques using the data state reference model", INFORMATION VISUALIZATION, 2000. INFOVIS 2000. IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SALT LAKE CITY, UT, USA 9-10 OCT. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20001009), doi:DOI:10.1109/INFVIS.2000.885092, ISBN 978-0-7695-0804-7, pages 69 - 75, XP010523995 [A] 11-43 * line 3 of the table "Visible Human Project [NLM], last row "Within View"; page 71 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFVIS.2000.885092 | [A] - Pace D. et al., "MR-guided Prostate Interventions with 3D Slicer and the NA-MIC Kit", NCIGT-SNR Tutorial, (20090131), page SLIDE 23, URL: http://www.slicer.org/publications/item/view/1605, (20110512), XP002636524 [A] 11-43 * the whole document * | [A] - VERMA B ET AL, "A novel soft cluster neural network for the classification of suspicious areas in digital mammograms", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, vol. 42, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.PATCOG.2009.02.009, ISSN 0031-3203, (20090901), pages 1845 - 1852, (20090305), XP026148572 [A] 56-76 * page 1848; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2009.02.009 | Examination | US2008025592 | US2009171236 | - Committee on New Approaches to Early Detection and Diagnosis of Breast Cancer, Saving Women's Lives - Strategies for Improving Breast Cancer Detection and Diagnosis, Washington, D.C, National Academy Press, (20050318), pages 44 - 45, ISBN 0309092132 | by applicant | US5729620 | US5815591 | US6014452 | US6075879 | US6301378 | US6574357 | US6748044 | US6909795 | US7218766 | US2009087067 | US7630533 | - ALONZO-PROULX, "Validation of a Method for Measuring the Volumetric Breast Density from Digital Mammograms", PHYS. MED. BIOL., (2010), vol. 55, pages 3027 - 3044 |