EP2421511 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COMMERCIAL NANOPARTICLE AND MICROPARTICLE POWDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iceutica Pty Ltd 52 Fairfield Street Mount Hawthorn, WA 6016 / AU | [2018/10] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Iceutica Pty Ltd. 52 Fairfield Street Mouth Hawthorn, WA 6016 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODD, Aaron 368/58 Cook Road Centennial Park New South Wales 2021 / AU | 02 /
MEISER, Felix 7 Beecham Road Mount Claremont Western Australia 6010 / AU | 03 /
RUSSELL, Adrian 139 Gladstone Road Rivervale Western Australia 6103 / AU | 04 /
NORRET, Marck 26 Stone Crescent Darlington Western Australia 6070 / AU | 05 /
BOSCH, H., William 237 Rodney Circle Bryn Mawr Pennsylvania 19010 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Coehn, Markus, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10766516.8 | 23.04.2010 | WO2010AU00467 | Priority number, date | AU20090901747 | 24.04.2009 Original published format: AU 2009901747 | US20090172300P | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 172300 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010121323 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421511 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K31/196, A61K31/5415, A61K31/53, A01N39/04, A61K31/198, A61K31/565, A61K31/497, A01N55/02, A61K31/405, A61K31/57, A61K31/192, A01N57/20, A61K31/421, A61K33/04, A61K31/18, A61K31/122, A61K31/4709, A61K38/13, A61K9/00, A01N25/34 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
A01N25/12 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1682 (IL,US);
A61K9/16 (KR);
A01N25/10 (IL,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,IL,US);
A01N37/38 (IL,US);
A01N39/04 (IL);
A01N47/14 (IL);
A01N47/36 (IL,US);
A01N55/02 (IL,US);
A01N57/12 (IL);
A01N57/20 (IL,US);
A01N59/02 (IL);
A23L33/10 (IL,US);
A23P10/20 (EP,IL,US);
A23P10/30 (EP,IL,US);
A61J3/02 (IL,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/137 (IL,US);
A61K31/18 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/404 (IL,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/415 (IL,US);
A61K31/421 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/496 (IL,US);
A61K31/497 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/5415 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,IL,US);
A61K33/04 (IL,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/0075 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/145 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/12, A01N39/04, A01N47/14, A01N47/36, A01N57/12, A01N59/02 (EP,US);
A01N25/34, A01N39/04, A01N47/14, A01N47/36, A01N57/12, A01N59/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/09] | A61K9/14, A61K31/196, A61K31/5415, A61K31/53, A01N39/04, A61K31/198, A61K31/565, A61K31/497, A01N55/02, A61K31/405, A61K31/57, A61K31/192, A01N57/20, A61K31/421, A61K33/04, A61K31/18, A61K31/122, A61K31/4709, A61K38/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEWERBLICHEN NANOPARTIKEL- UND MIKROPARTIKELPULVERN | [2012/09] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF COMMERCIAL NANOPARTICLE AND MICROPARTICLE POWDERS | [2012/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA PRODUCTION DE POUDRES DE NANOPARTICULES ET DE MICROPARTICULES À USAGE COMMERCIAL | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006069419 (ICEUTICA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-14 * example H *; | [XP]WO2010017104 (INDIANA NANOTECH LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-14 * claims 1-15 *; | [E]WO2010121320 (ICEUTICA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [E] 1-14* page 50, line 1 - page 52, line 15 *; | [I] - VOGT ET AL, "Dissolution enhancement of fenofibrate by micronization, cogrinding and spray-drying: Comparison with commercial preparations", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS AND BIOPHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080110), vol. 68, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.EJPB.2007.05.010, ISSN 0939-6411, pages 283 - 288, XP022415420 [I] 1-14 * page 284, column r, line 5 - page 284, column r, line 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2007.05.010 | International search | [X]WO2004060344 (ACUSPHERE INC [US]); | [X]WO2005002542 (ELAN PHARMA INT LTD [IE], et al); | [A]WO2006031026 (CJ CORP [KR], et al); | [X]WO2006041843 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al); | [X]WO2006069419 (ICEUTICA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2007070851 (ACUSPHERE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008000042 (ICEUTICA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2008118331 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2008254128 (ZARKADAS DIMITRIOS [US], et al) |