EP2423059 - CAR ALARM APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIE, Hidetoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/09] | 01 /
HORIE, Hidetoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10766756.0 | 05.01.2010 | WO2010JP00022 | Priority number, date | JP20090104433 | 22.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009104433 | [2012/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122693 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423059 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2423059 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/10, G08B13/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B60R25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGALARMVORRICHTUNG | [2012/09] | English: | CAR ALARM APPARATUS | [2012/09] | French: | APPAREIL D'ALARME DE VOITURE | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2011 | Translation filed | 28.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2010 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | HR | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | MK | 13.02.2013 | MT | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | SM | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | NO | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.01.2010 | |
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.01.2010 | |
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
SM | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
MT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
HR | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
NO | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
NO | 13.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0431059U (NN) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3422398 (RUBIN NORMAN S) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 10-18; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 18-33 *; | [A]GB849203 (EDWARD PERCIVAL RAJU) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 53-59; figure 15 *; | [A]FR1406176 (ALFRED) [A] 1 * page 1; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS61111863U (U-SHIN LTD.); | [A]JP2001071870 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2008105527 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0431059U |