EP2424300 - GATEWAY APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM IN WHICH COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM IS STORED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Kenji c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | MacDougall, Alan John Shaw Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10766775.0 | 16.03.2010 | WO2010JP01881 | Priority number, date | JP20090102034 | 20.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009102034 | [2012/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122712 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2424300 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/08, H04W36/10, H04W84/10, H04W88/16, // H04W36/00, H04W28/06, H04W84/04 | [2015/20] | CPC: |
H04W36/0011 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/16 (KR);
H04W36/38 (KR);
H04W8/02 (KR);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04W36/10 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/09] | H04W36/08, H04W36/10, H04W84/10, H04W88/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Title | German: | GATEWAYVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND NICHTTRANSITORISCHES COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM MIT DARAUF GESPEICHERTEM STEUERPROGRAMM | [2012/09] | English: | GATEWAY APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, NON-TRANSITORY COMPUTER READABLE MEDIUM IN WHICH COMMUNICATION CONTROL PROGRAM IS STORED | [2012/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE PASSERELLE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION, SUPPORT NON TRANSITOIRE POUVANT ÊTRE LU PAR ORDINATEUR, DANS LEQUEL EST MÉMORISÉ UN PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION EST STOCKÉ | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2011 | Translation filed | 14.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 10.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/03] | 12.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1107633 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]US2007298800 (WILLIAMS ANDREW G [GB], et al); | International search | [A]JP2000083273 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2009510871 ; | by applicant | JP2008263632 | JP2009102034 |