EP2433990 - WATER-BASED INKJET INK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INKJET PRINTED PRODUCT USING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING WATER-BASED INKJET INK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta IJ Technologies, Inc. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2012/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHYA Hidenobu c/o Konica Minolta IJ Technologies Inc. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo 1918511 / JP | 02 /
KANEKO Manabu c/o Konica Minolta IJ Technologies Inc. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 03 /
KATO Masami c/o Konica Minolta IJ Technologies Inc. 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10767051.5 | 20.04.2010 | [2016/09] | WO2010JP56984 | Priority number, date | JP20090105066 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: JP 2009105066 | JP20090124076 | 22.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009124076 | [2012/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010122994 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433990 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433990 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/326, C09D11/40 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
C09D11/326 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/13] | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENSTRAHLTINTE AUF WASSERBASIS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TINTENSTRAHLBEDRUCKTEN PRODUKTS DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER TINTENSTRAHLTINTE AUF WASSERBASIS | [2012/13] | English: | WATER-BASED INKJET INK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN INKJET PRINTED PRODUCT USING THE SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING WATER-BASED INKJET INK | [2012/13] | French: | ENCRE À L'EAU POUR L'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT IMPRIMÉ PAR JET D'ENCRE L'UTILISANT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ENCRE À L'EAU POUR L'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE | [2012/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2011 | Translation filed | 20.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 09.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2010 | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | TR | 02.03.2016 | IE | 20.04.2016 | LU | 20.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | MT | 30.04.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.04.2010 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
TR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2016 | ||
LU | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.04.2010 | |
AT | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007044109 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0016] *; | [I]EP0974626 (DU PONT [US]) [I] 1-12 * example - * | International search | [X]JP2008019431 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2006282780 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JP2007119708 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2007253616 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2006299166 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2004204069 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2007321073 (CANON FINETECH INC); | [X]JPH09263722 (HITACHI MAXELL) | by applicant | JP2000044858 | JP2005113147 | JP2007297586 | JP2004114692 | JP2005220352 | JP2006022328 | JP2006282822 | JPS5774193 | JPS5787988 | JPS62261476 | JPS5774192 | JPS5787989 | JPS6072785 | JPS61146591 | JPH0195091 | JPH0313376 | JPS5942993 | JPS5952689 | JPS62280069 | JPS61242871 | JPH04219266 |