EP2421600 - SPINAL CORD MODULATION SYSTEMS FOR INDUCING PARESTHETIC AND ANESTHETIC EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | SPINAL CORD MODULATION FOR INDUCING PARESTHETIC AND ANESTHETIC EFFECTS, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
[2013/37] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nevro Corporation 1800 Bridge Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2018/39] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nevro Corporation 4040 Campbell Avenue, Suite 210 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Nevro Corporation 411 Acacia Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALATARIS, Konstantinos 2049 Monroe Avenue Belmont CA 94002 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Andre, B. 15174 Via Del Sur Monte Sereno CA 95030 / US | 03 /
PARKER, Jon 2534 Custer Drive San Jose CA 95124 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Donald, Jenny Susan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10767788.2 | 22.04.2010 | WO2010US32110 | Priority number, date | US20090171790P | 22.04.2009 Original published format: US 171790 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124128 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421600 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2421600 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61N1/36021 (US);
A61N1/36132 (EP,US);
A61N1/3615 (EP,US);
A61N1/36171 (US);
A61N1/36178 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/09] | A61N1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKENMARKSMODULATIONSSYTEME ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON PARÄSTHETISCHEN UND ANÄSTHETISCHEN EFFEKTEN | [2013/37] | English: | SPINAL CORD MODULATION SYSTEMS FOR INDUCING PARESTHETIC AND ANESTHETIC EFFECTS | [2013/37] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE MODULATION DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE POUR INDUIRE DES EFFETS PARESTHÉSIQUES | [2013/37] |
Former [2012/09] | RÜCKENMARKSMODULATION ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON PARÄSTHETISCHEN UND ANÄSTHETISCHEN EFFEKTEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2012/09] | SPINAL CORD MODULATION FOR INDUCING PARESTHETIC AND ANESTHETIC EFFECTS, AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS | ||
Former [2012/09] | MODULATION DE LA MOELLE ÉPINIÈRE POUR INDUIRE DES EFFETS PARESTHÉSIQUES ET ANESTHÉSIQUES, ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14152029.6 / EP2756864 | EP23161609.5 Application withdrawn : 21.03.2023 | EP23161920.6 / EP4257178 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2014
23.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2014
23.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2014
Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US Opponent's representative Asmussen, Arnold, et al, et al Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 15.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.04.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.11.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/50] | Appeal following opposition | 23.05.2017 | Appeal received No. T1450/17 | 14.08.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.10.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 13.08.2020 | Appeal received No. J0019/20 | 22.09.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 23.08.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2018/40] | 23.08.2018 | Stay of proceedings | [2022/42] | 01.12.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/42] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MK | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | SM | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | IE | 22.04.2014 | LU | 22.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | NO | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.04.2010 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.04.2010 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | |
NO | 05.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2003120323 (MEADOWS PAUL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2006100671 (DE RIDDER DIRK [BE]); | [Y]US2007066997 (HE TOM X [US], et al) |