EP2421821 - NITROGEN CONTAININIG ISETHIONIC ACID SALT IN STABLE AGRICULTURAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/09] | NITROGEN CONTAININIG ISETHIONIC ACID SALT IN REGISTERABLE, STABLE AGRICULTURAL FORMULATIONS | ||
[2017/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Petrochemical LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | [2017/30] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Huntsman Petrochemical LLC 10003 Woodloch Forest Drive The Woodlands, TX 77380 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANN, R., Scott 2424 Oyster Loop Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | 02 /
STRIDDE, Howard, M. 821 South Peck Shiner, TX 77984 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Van den Broeck, Kristel Alice Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | ||
Former [2013/07] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Van Steenlandt, Wim August Maria, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 10767808.8 | 23.04.2010 | [2017/30] | WO2010US32147 | Priority number, date | US20090172398P | 24.04.2009 Original published format: US 172398 P | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010124152 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2421821 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2421821 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/20, A01N25/02 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A01N57/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N57/20, A01N25/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2012/42] | C07C309/08, A01N57/20 | ||
Former IPC [2012/09] | C07C233/10, A01N49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STICKSTOFFHALTIGES ISETHIONSÄURESALZ IN STABILEN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN FORMULIERUNGEN | [2017/16] | English: | NITROGEN CONTAININIG ISETHIONIC ACID SALT IN STABLE AGRICULTURAL FORMULATIONS | [2017/16] | French: | AZOTE CONTENANT UN SEL D'ACIDE ISÉTHIONIQUE PRÉSENT DANS DES PRÉPARATIONS AGRICOLES STABLES | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/09] | STICKSTOFFHALTIGES ISETHIONSÄURESALZ IN REGISTRIERBAREN STABILEN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN FORMULIERUNGEN | ||
Former [2012/09] | NITROGEN CONTAININIG ISETHIONIC ACID SALT IN REGISTERABLE, STABLE AGRICULTURAL FORMULATIONS | ||
Former [2012/09] | AZOTE CONTENANT UN SEL D'ACIDE ISÉTHIONIQUE PRÉSENT DANS DES PRÉPARATIONS AGRICOLES STABLES, HOMOLOGABLES | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 23.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2010 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | IE | 23.04.2018 | LU | 23.04.2018 | MT | 23.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.04.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
MT | 23.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2018 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PRATT D ET AL, "SUBSTITUTES FOR AMMONIUM SULFATE AS ADDITIVES WITH GLYPHOSATE AND GLUFOSINATE", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, LONDON, (20030101), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 576 - 581, XP009039276 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5352822 (BLADE ROBERT J [GB], et al); | [Y]US4571309 (LEGE CURTIS S [US]); | [Y]US3692512 (SACHNIK NORMAN HENRY); | [A]US2008300161 (SCHULTZ ALFRED K [US]); | [A]US5523432 (RATHS HANS-CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US3408174 (LINDNER PAUL L) | by applicant | US3799758 | EP0088180 | WO2010009820 |