EP2493712 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF AN AIR-CONDITIONING LOOP IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jin-Ming 29 rue des Hautes Roches F-78770 Conflans Saint Honorine / FR | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Vieillevigne, Sébastien Nicolas Bernard VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES Service Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière - B.P. 513 78321 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10768011.8 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010EP65556 | Priority number, date | FR20090005146 | 26.10.2009 Original published format: FR 0905146 | [2012/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051119 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2493712 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2493712 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
B60H1/3208 (EP,US);
B60H1/3211 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3238 (EP,US);
B60H2001/325 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3257 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES KLIMATISIERIERUNGSKREISLAUFES IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2012/36] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF AN AIR-CONDITIONING LOOP IN A VEHICLE | [2012/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE BOUCLE DE CLIMATISATION D'UN VÉHICULE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2010 | AL | 15.07.2015 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | MT | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | RS | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | GB | 15.10.2015 | IE | 15.10.2015 | LU | 15.10.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
GB | 15.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BG | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MT | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
GB | 15.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GB | 15.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GB | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GB | 15.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
LU | 15.10.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RS | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19743828 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 57 * * figure - *; | [A]DE10355317 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1459920 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1749681 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1* abstract * |