EP2478677 - AN APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A DATA PACKET, A DATA PACKET PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Napatech A/S Tobaksvejen 23A 2860 Søborg / DK | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOPHERSEN, Jens Klavs Nebs Vej 21 DK-2830 Virum / DK | [2013/27] |
Former [2012/30] | 01 /
CHRISTOPHERSEN, Jens Klaus Nebs Vej 10C DK-2830 Virum / DK | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 10768194.2 | 15.09.2010 | WO2010EP63508 | Priority number, date | US20090242567P | 15.09.2009 Original published format: US 242567 P | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032954 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2478677 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2478677 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/721, H04L12/747, H04L12/801 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L43/026 (KR);
H04L45/7453 (KR);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/2441 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/4641 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2012/30] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Extension states | BA | 16.04.2012 | ME | 16.04.2012 | RS | 16.04.2012 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE EINES DATENPAKETS, DATENPAKETVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2012/30] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A DATA PACKET, A DATA PACKET PROCESSING SYSTEM AND A METHOD | [2012/30] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANALYSE D'UN PAQUET DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN PAQUET DE DONNÉES | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 28.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2010 | AL | 10.07.2013 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | HR | 10.07.2013 | LT | 10.07.2013 | LV | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | MK | 10.07.2013 | MT | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | SM | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | LU | 15.09.2013 | NO | 10.10.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | ES | 21.10.2013 | IS | 10.11.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LU | 15.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
MK | 10.07.2013 | ||
MT | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
TR | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
SM | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
LV | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
ES | 21.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
IS | 10.11.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
HR | 10.07.2013 | ||
LT | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 10.07.2013 | |
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
NO | 10.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003063611 (SCHAUB MARC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12-16 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0043] , [0044] , [0046] , [0048] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 1-16; | [A]US2003067930 (SALAPURA VALENTINA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0012] - [0026] - [0039] , [0043] - [0054] *; | [XI]US2005254502 (CHOI LYNN [KR]) [X] 1,4-9,12-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0040] - [0049] - [0052] - [0067] * * table 1 * [I] 1-16; | [XI]US2008198867 (MOLL LAURENT [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9,12-16 * paragraphs [0013] , [0047] - [0053] - [0094] , [0096] , [0106] - [0115] * * tables 2,3 * [I] 1-16; | [A]US2009006521 (VEAL BRYAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0039] - [0044] * | by applicant | US6597661 | US7212526 | US2007168377 | US7529242 | WO2009099573 |