EP2496824 - CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ-AMAYA, Nestor Dennerstr. 70 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
RUTHARDT, Siegfried Pfarrgartenstr. 2 71155 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
RAPP, Holger Birkenweg 22 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 04 /
STOECKLEIN, Wolfgang Haydnweg 2 71332 Waiblingen / DE | 05 /
BERGHAENEL, Bernd Kopernikusstr. 2/2 75428 Illingen / DE | 06 /
BEIER, Marco Bertastr. 31 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/37] | Application number, filing date | 10768197.5 | 30.09.2010 | WO2010EP64516 | Priority number, date | DE20091046332 | 03.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009046332 | [2012/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054607 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496824 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2496824 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02M65/00, F02M63/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
F02M65/005 (EP);
F02M63/0015 (EP);
F02M63/004 (EP);
F02D2041/2051 (EP);
F02D2041/2055 (EP);
F02D2041/2058 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVENTILANORDNUNG | [2012/37] | English: | CONTROL VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2012/37] | French: | ENSEMBLE SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2010 | AL | 25.02.2015 | BG | 25.02.2015 | CY | 25.02.2015 | CZ | 25.02.2015 | DK | 25.02.2015 | EE | 25.02.2015 | ES | 25.02.2015 | FI | 25.02.2015 | HR | 25.02.2015 | IT | 25.02.2015 | LT | 25.02.2015 | LV | 25.02.2015 | MC | 25.02.2015 | MK | 25.02.2015 | MT | 25.02.2015 | NL | 25.02.2015 | PL | 25.02.2015 | PT | 25.02.2015 | RO | 25.02.2015 | SE | 25.02.2015 | SI | 25.02.2015 | SK | 25.02.2015 | SM | 25.02.2015 | TR | 25.02.2015 | NO | 25.05.2015 | GR | 26.05.2015 | IS | 25.06.2015 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | GB | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PT | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MK | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
BG | 25.02.2015 | ||
CY | 25.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2015 | ||
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
SM | 25.02.2015 | ||
TR | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/17] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
MT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
MC | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SI | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
IT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
PL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 25.02.2015 | |
DK | 25.02.2015 | ||
EE | 25.02.2015 | ||
ES | 25.02.2015 | ||
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
RO | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
SK | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
NL | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
LV | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
IS | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
GR | 26.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
FI | 25.02.2015 | ||
HR | 25.02.2015 | ||
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
SE | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 25.02.2015 | |
LT | 25.02.2015 | ||
NO | 25.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 25.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102007060395 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, paragraphs 0029,0030; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2231630 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 8 * page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE19930309 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102007060395 |