EP2494721 - RADIOFREQUENCY COMMUNICATION CONTROLLED BY A MICROCIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEROY, Pascal 2 rue de Cinqueux F-60870 Rieux / FR | 02 /
LEIBENGUTH, Joseph 72 rue Royale F-92210 Saint - Cloud / FR | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Milharo, Emilien, et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier BP 90, Z.I. Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10768245.2 | 22.10.2010 | WO2010EP66004 | Priority number, date | EP20090306034 | 29.10.2009 Original published format: EP 09306034 | [2012/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011051193 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494721 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H20/61, H04H60/16 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H04H60/15 (EP,US);
H04H60/16 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04W12/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | VON EINER MIKROSCHALTUNG GESTEUERTE HOCHFREQUENZ-KOMMUNIKATION | [2012/36] | English: | RADIOFREQUENCY COMMUNICATION CONTROLLED BY A MICROCIRCUIT | [2012/36] | French: | COMMUNICATION RADIOFREQUENCE CONTRÔLEE PAR MICROCIRCUIT | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 25.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/19] | 22.12.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2004100060 (AXALTO SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 7, lines 15-24 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 3 * * figures 4-5 *[A] 2,3,5-11; | [XI]US2007021057 (ARSENEAU MARC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0097] - [0103] * * paragraphs [0185] , [0188] , [0193] , [0198] - [0199] * * paragraphs [0201] - [0212] - [0205] , [0211] , [0214] * * paragraphs [0373] - [0374] - [0379] - [0392] - [0397] * * figures 4,25 * [I] 4 | Examination | US2003069805 | US2006167806 | US2007240190 | by applicant | EP1627347 |