EP2491163 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR IMPROVED ZINCATING OF MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOY SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/35] | COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR IMPROVED ZINCATING MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOY SUBSTRATES | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS IP Association Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILES, Jacob G. 866 Knightsbridge Road Fort Mill, South Carolina 29708 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Nayan H. 2168 Summers Glen Rock Hill, South Carolina 29732 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Wonnemann, Jörg Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 10768354.2 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010US52771 | Priority number, date | US20090603743 | 22.10.2009 Original published format: US 603743 | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011049818 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491163 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2491163 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/31 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
C23C18/31 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE MAGNESIUMVERZINKUNG UND MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNGSSUBSTRATE | [2012/35] | English: | COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR IMPROVED ZINCATING OF MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOY SUBSTRATES | [2013/18] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À AMÉLIORER LE DÉPÔT DE ZINC SUR DES SUBSTRATS À BASE DE MAGNÉSIUM ET D'ALLIAGES DE MAGNÉSIUM | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/35] | COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR IMPROVED ZINCATING MAGNESIUM AND MAGNESIUM ALLOY SUBSTRATES | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2010 | AL | 02.10.2013 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | RS | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | IE | 15.10.2013 | LU | 15.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.10.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]CN101153388 (BYD CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US6068938 (KATO JUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2730490 (HENDRICH ROBERT T, et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | CN101153388 | US2730490 |