EP2491245 - A LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR A GEAR SYSTEM OF A WIND TURBINE PROVIDING EMERGENCY LUBRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/35] | A LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR A GEAR SYSTEM PROVIDING EMERGENCY LUBRICATION | ||
[2013/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Thomas Korsgaard Skansen 2 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 10768490.4 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010EP65872 | Priority number, date | DK20090070169 | 23.10.2009 Original published format: DK 200970169 | US20090254479P | 23.10.2009 Original published format: US 254479 P | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011048183 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2491245 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2491245 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, F16H57/04 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F16H57/0447 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERSYSTEM FÜR EIN GETRIEBESYSTEM MIT NOTSCHMIERUNG | [2012/35] | English: | A LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR A GEAR SYSTEM OF A WIND TURBINE PROVIDING EMERGENCY LUBRICATION | [2013/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LUBRIFICATION DESTINÉ À UN SYSTÈME D'ENGRENAGE ET ASSURANT UNE LUBRIFICATION D'URGENCE | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/35] | A LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR A GEAR SYSTEM PROVIDING EMERGENCY LUBRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 30.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2010 | AL | 11.12.2013 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | HR | 11.12.2013 | IT | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MK | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | RS | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | SM | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | NO | 11.03.2014 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MK | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
MT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
IT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
SM | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RS | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
HR | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
NO | 11.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | |
NO | 11.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2201200 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE) [AD] 1-10 * page 1 - page 5; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1431575 (WINERGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]WO03031812 (HANSEN TRANSMISSIONS INT [BE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 3 - page 4; figure 1; claims 1-7 * | by applicant | GB2201200 |