EP2486720 - KEYPAD FOR A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NILSSON, Bengt, Krister Hans Jonasväg 18 S-237 37 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
TOLBERT, William, Haywood Regementsgatan 72 S-217 51 Malmö / SE | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10768860.8 | 02.09.2010 | WO2010EP05392 | Priority number, date | US20090573198 | 05.10.2009 Original published format: US 573198 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011042097 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2486720 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/23, H01H3/20, H01H13/705 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H04M1/23 (EP,US);
H01H13/705 (EP,US);
H01H2221/016 (EP,US);
H01H2221/068 (EP,US);
H01H2223/052 (EP,US);
H01H2227/036 (EP,US);
H01H2231/022 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | TASTATUR FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNG | [2012/33] | English: | KEYPAD FOR A MOBILE DEVICE | [2012/33] | French: | CLAVIER DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/21] | 29.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6201199 (CHEW KWAN WEE ANTHONY [SG], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009000936 (STEIJNER MAGNUS [SE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [I]WO2009026405 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [I] 1,9-11 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 2-18B * |